Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-10-07 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9584117) filed by JAMES MOSCOU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-07 | 2 | SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JAMES MOSCOU(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-07 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JAMES MOSCOU (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-07 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JAMES MOSCOU (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 10/07/2022) |
2022-10-11 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 6 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/11/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/20/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/20/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-03 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 11/03/2022) |
2022-11-18 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2022-11-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Government's 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is Granted. The Government must respond to the complaint by December 28, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/18/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/18/2022) |
2022-11-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/28/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 11/21/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2022-12-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule by January 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/28/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/28/2022) |
2022-12-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/30/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 12/28/2022) |
2023-01-30 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file Joint Status Reports every 60 days beginning on April 1, 2023, apprising the Court on the status of the Government's processing and production. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/31/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-01-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2023, and every 60 days thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JAMES MOSCOU (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-04-03 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on June 14, 2023. After that, the parties shall continue submitting such reports every 60 days. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/3/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2023, and every 60 days thereafter. (hmc) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-06-14 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 06/14/2023) |
2023-08-14 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2024-02-12 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |