Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-11-28 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9695729) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A & B, # 3 Summons to US Attorney, # 4 Summons to Dept of Commerce, # 5 Summons to the Attorney General)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 11/28/2022) |
2022-11-28 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 11/28/2022) |
2022-11-29 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zcb) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-29 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2023-01-06 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before February 9, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/11/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-02-09 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 02/09/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before April 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/13/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-04-10 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Propose Production Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 04/10/2023) |
2023-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before April 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/12/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before 4/20/2023. (jth) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-20 | 7 | STATUS REPORT and Proposed Production Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 04/20/2023) |
2023-04-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 7 status report, the parties must file another status report by June 19, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/26/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 04/26/2023) |
2023-06-20 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 06/20/2023) |
2023-06-23 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 8 status report, the parties must file another status report by August 21, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/23/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 9 status report, the parties must file another status report by October 23, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/22/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 10 status report, the parties must file another status report by November 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/30/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 11 status report, the parties must file another status report by January 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/28/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2024-01-08 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 12 status report, the parties must file another status report by March 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/10/2024. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
2024-03-08 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
2024-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the 13 status report, the parties must file another status report by May 8, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/8/2024. (lcabj1) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |