Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-11-29 | 1 | COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9699206) filed by SETH HETTENA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1-6, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-29 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-29 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 11/29/2022) |
2022-11-30 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zljn) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2022-11-30 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2023-01-11 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-01-11 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants must respond to the complaint by February 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/11/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant must file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before March 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/13/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 12/19/2022 (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/2022. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-02-16 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2023. (Loevy, Joshua) Modified service and answer dates on 2/17/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 02/16/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 12 | STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 12 defendant's status report, the parties must file a status report by June 30, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/15/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of 13 defendant's status report, the parties must file another status report by August 29, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/5/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-08-29 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/29/2023) |
2023-08-30 | | MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the following schedule will apply: defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by November 10, 2023; plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment, supported by a single memorandum, is due by December 19, 2023; any reply and cross-opposition, supported by a single memorandum, is due by January 12, 2024; and any cross-reply is due by February 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/30/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 08/30/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 15 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2023-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by December 13, 2023; plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment, supported by a single memorandum, is due by January 19, 2024; any reply and cross-opposition, supported by a single memorandum, is due by February 20, 2024; and any cross-reply is due by March 22, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/14/2023.(lcabj1) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2023-12-13 | 16 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/13/2023) |
2023-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due by December 15, 2023; plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment, supported by a single memorandum, is due by January 22, 2024; any reply and cross-opposition, supported by a single memorandum, is due by February 20, 2024; and any cross-reply is due by March 26, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/14/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 12/14/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 17 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Mary C. Williams, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2024-01-18 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Stich Match on behalf of SETH HETTENA (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 01/18/2024) |
2024-01-18 | 19 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Briefing Schedule by SETH HETTENA. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 01/18/2024) |
2024-01-19 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment, supported by a single memorandum, is due by February 5, 2024; any reply and cross-opposition, supported by a single memorandum, is due by March 5, 2024; and any cross-reply is due by April 9, 2024. Given how expansive the briefing schedule is, the Court expects the parties to adhere to it. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/19/2024. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-01-30 | 20 | Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by SETH HETTENA. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 01/30/2024) |
2024-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment, supported by a single memorandum, is due by May 6, 2024; any reply and cross-opposition, supported by a single memorandum, is due by June 6, 2024; and any cross-reply is due by June 27, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/30/2024. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/30/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |