Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-11-30 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29136575) filed by Ryan, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2022-11-30 | 2 | Request for Issuance of Summons as to U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Continuation Request for Issuance of Summons, # 2 Continuation Request for Issuance of Summons)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/30/2022) |
2022-12-01 | 3 | ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/01/2022) |
2022-12-01 | 4 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Treasury, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 12/01/2022) |
2022-12-09 | 5 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 12/09/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Nishant Kumar on behalf of U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 7 | MOTION for Nishant Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2023. (Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-13 | 8 | ORDER - Granting 7 Motion for Nishant Kumar to Appear Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Department of the Treasury Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here . (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2022) |
2022-12-14 | 9 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed.(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-19 | 10 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time respond to Complaint by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/9/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
2022-12-19 | 11 | ORDER - Granting 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time respond to Complaint ; Answer due for U.S. Department of the Treasury 1/17/2023. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 12/19/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 12 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. Department of the Treasury, filed.(Kumar, Nishant) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 13 | Joint MOTION Cancellation of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference by Ryan, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment - Joint Discovery and Case Management Plan, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Cancellation of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 14 | ORDER - Granting 13 Joint MOTION Cancellation of Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference. ORDERED that the March 31, 2023 Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference is CANCELLED; It is ORDERED that the parties are to submit the first of their Joint Status Reports on March 31, 2023, and every 60 days thereafter, in accordance with the terms of the Joint Case Management Plan. ( Status Report due by 3/31/2023 and every 60 days thereafter ) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 15 | Joint MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by Ryan, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint Proposed Amended Complaint Substituting Defendant)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 16 | ORDER - Granting 15 Joint MOTION to Amend Complaint to Substitute Defendant; the District Clerk SHALL file the First Amended Complaint, attached to the motion, among the papers of this case. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 17 | AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service filed by Ryan, LLC.(sanderson, 4) *** File pursuant to 16 Order *** (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 19 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report by Ryan, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time)(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 20 | ORDER - Granting 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Status Report. ORDERED that the parties are to submit the Joint Status Report by June 7, 2023. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-06 | 21 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 06/06/2023) |
2023-07-31 | 22 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 07/31/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 23 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 24 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2024-01-22 | 25 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan, LLC, filed.(Dumesnil, Bryan) (Entered: 01/22/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |