Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716857) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Proposed to AG, US Attorney, and Defendant, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 4 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 7, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-30 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/30/2022) |
2022-12-30 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/30/2022) |
2022-12-30 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint on or before January 27, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 30, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/30/2022) |
2022-12-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/27/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-30 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before February 17, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 30, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/17/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 18, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 22, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/18/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-04-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 18, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 19, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/19/2023) |
2023-04-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/18/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 04/19/2023) |
2023-05-18 | 10 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-05-19 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 16, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 19, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/16/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-06-16 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-06-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 18, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 21, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-06-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/18/2023 (zjch, ) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 12 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | | MINUTE ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice in light of the parties' 12 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 12, 2023. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |