Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716878) filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency Counsel)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-07 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/07/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 5 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 6 | Memorandum in opposition to re 5 Motion for Extension of Time to , RESPONSE re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by INSTITUTE FOR ENERGY RESEARCH. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 7 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2022-12-28 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the 5 motion and plaintiff's position, it is ORDERED that the defendant must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by February 6, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/28/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 12/28/2022) |
2023-02-06 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-06 | 9 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of defendant's 9 status report, the parties must submit a joint status report by April 7, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/08/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/08/2023) |
2023-04-08 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 04/08/2023) |
2023-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 10 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by May 5, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 04/11/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by May 31, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/08/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by June 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 05/15/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-06-12 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/12/2023) |
2023-06-15 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 13 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by July 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 06/15/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/15/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by August 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/13/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/13/2023) |
2023-08-11 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 15 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by September 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/14/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-09-11 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-13 | | MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 16 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by November 9, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/13/2023. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 17 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |