Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9716936) filed by TWIN-CITY MOTOR COMPANY BUILDING, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B)(Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2022-12-08 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-08 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/08/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 3 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 12, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 4 | AFFIDAVIT of Mailing to United States Attorney General (Patel, Vivek) Modified on 1/4/2023 to correct event (zjm). (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 5 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 1/2/2023. (Patel, Vivek); Modified on 12/20/2022 - Said pleading was entered in error at the request of counsel (ztth). (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 12/12/2022 (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/12/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/11/2023. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2023-01-04 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/19/2022. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-01-06 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tobin, Olga) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by March 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 9, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 10 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |