Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Jen Winkelman, filed by Lucas Canton Schneider.(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-16 | 2 | Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-16 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lucas Canton Schneider. (Attachments: # 1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2023-06-27 | 4 | SCREENING ORDER: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS. Plaintiff has 30 days to voluntarily dismiss this action. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 6/27/23. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 06/27/2023) |
2023-09-28 | 5 | ORDER OF DISMISSAL & NOTICE OF STRIKE : This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. This dismissal counts as a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 9/28/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/28/2023) |
2023-10-02 | 6 | JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 10/2/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/02/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |