Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9744442) filed by ERIN SIEGAL MCINTYRE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to CBP, # 3 Summons Summons to USAO, # 4 Summons Summons to USAG)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 2 | SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ERIN SIEGAL MCINTYRE re 1 Complaint, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/21/2022) |
2022-12-21 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 12/21/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 4 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/22/22. (DM) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-01-23 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Relying on the heavy workloads at the U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia, counsel for Defendant requests the Court extend Defendant's time to answer from January 27, 2023 to February 27, 2023. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 27, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 23, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 2/27/2023. (dot) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-02-27 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 8 | ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before March 27, 2023. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 1, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 3/27/2023. (dot) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. Upon consideration thereof, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 20, 2023 and, if necessary, every ninety days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 23, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-03-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2023, and, if necessary, every ninety days thereafter. (dot) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-06-20 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/20/2023) |
2023-09-18 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
2023-12-18 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |