Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29224129) filed by Matthew Paul Nickson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nickson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 2 | Request for Issuance of Summons as to US Department of State, filed.(Nickson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-20 | 3 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Matthew Paul Nickson, filed.(Nickson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/20/2022) |
2022-12-21 | 4 | ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/7/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 12/21/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 5 | Summons Issued as to US Department of State. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(RhondaMooreKonieczny, 4) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-01-19 | 6 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint by US Department of State, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-03-28 | 7 | JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by US Department of State, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 03/28/2023) |
2023-03-29 | 8 | NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 4/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett, filed. (ledwards, 4) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-04-14 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alfred H Bennett. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 4/14/2023. Dates agreed, scheduling order to follow. Appearances: Matthew Paul Nickson, Myra Farah Siddiqui.(Court Reporter: M.Malone), filed.(ledwards, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2023) |
2023-04-14 | 9 | SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings and Addition of New Parties due by 6/15/2023. Pltf Experts due by 7/14/2023. Deft Experts due by 8/15/2023. Motion Filing due by 2/9/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/26/2024. Docket Call set for 5/10/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett. Trial set for 5/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Alfred H Bennett(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(HeatherCarr, 4) (Entered: 04/14/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 10 | STATUS REPORT by US Department of State, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 11 | STATUS REPORT by US Department of State, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2024-01-10 | 12 | STATUS REPORT by US Department of State, filed.(Siddiqui, Myra) (Entered: 01/10/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |