Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9749851) filed by KATHERINE BLEACH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to USCIS, # 3 Summons Summons to Graves, # 4 Summons Summons to Garland)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-22 | | Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zcb) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-22 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-01-06 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 12/29/2022, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/30/2022., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/22/2022. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/21/2023.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Proof of Service)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-19 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-19 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 6 | INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/31/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order due by 2/24/2023. (tb) (Entered: 02/01/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Graham-Oliver on behalf of UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than March 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/24/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2023. (tb) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than March 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/14/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023. (jth) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-15 | | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023. (tb) Modified on 3/15/2023 (tb). (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-15 | | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/20/2023. (tb) Modified on 3/15/2023 (tb). (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than April 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/21/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 03/21/2023) |
2023-03-24 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/28/2023. (tb) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-05-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the March 21, 2023 minute order, the parties were required to submit a joint status report by not later than April 28, 2023. The parties are accordingly ORDERED to submit a joint status report by not later than May 18, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/10/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2023. (tb) (Entered: 05/11/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than July 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/16/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-05-16 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2023. (tb) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-07-20 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/20/2023) |
2023-07-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than September 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/21/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 07/21/2023) |
2023-07-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2023. (kk) (Entered: 07/21/2023) |
2023-09-12 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by not later than November 20, 2023. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/12/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/20/2023. (zed) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: On September 12, 2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint status report by not later than November 20, 2023. As of December 12, 2023, no status report has been filed. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file the joint status report by not later than December 19, 2023. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/12/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2023-12-13 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/13/2023) |
2023-12-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report by not later than January 19, 2024. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/18/2023. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 12/18/2023) |
2024-01-17 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/17/2024) |
2024-01-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by not later than March 19, 2024. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/18/2024. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 01/18/2024) |
2024-01-18 | 16 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by KATHERINE BLEACH. (Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2024) |
2024-01-18 | | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/19/2024. (zed) Case has been terminated. (zed). (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |