Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT GEORGE VON KALTNER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9750498) filed by George Von Kaltner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons DHS, # 3 Summons CBP, # 4 Summons US Att for DC, # 5 Summons Att Gen, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-23 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmrl) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 2 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2023-02-14 | 3 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION DIVISION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before March 15, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2-22-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/18/2023. (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/17/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/13/2023. (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION DIVISION served on 1/17/2023 (O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-15 | 8 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION DIVISION.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a 16.3 Report on or before March 30, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3-16-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-03-22 | 9 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit 16.3 Report by GEORGE VON KALTNER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Brett) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-03-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants shall have through and including April 12,2023 to submit a 16.3 Report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3-22-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/22/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 10 | Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION DIVISION. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-13 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report by no later than June 12, 2023, apprising the Court of the parties' progress towards resolving the case, in the event that the case has not already been dismissed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4-13-2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-05-11 | 11 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, US CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION DIVISION (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 05/11/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |