Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-12-22 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9751709) filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2022-12-23 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 12/23/2022) |
2022-12-27 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zljn) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2022-12-27 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 12/27/2022) |
2023-01-04 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/30/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/29/2023. (Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 01/04/2023) |
2023-01-24 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/24/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-31 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and propose a joint briefing schedule by February 14, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/31/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-01-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/14/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-14 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-02-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 28, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/14/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-02-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 02/15/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 14, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/1/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-14 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by July 3, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/15/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/3/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 03/17/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 10 | MOTION to Vacate Order by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Ex, A, # 2 Ex. B)(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 11 | RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Vacate Order filed by VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Hughes, Paul) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer to see if they can reach a further agreement on a processing schedule. They shall then submit a further Joint Status Report by April 4, 2023. In the event that agreement is not reached, the Court will resolve the pending Motion to Vacate. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/28/23. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 03/28/2023) |
2023-03-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 03/28/2023) |
2023-03-29 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-03-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties' 12 JSR is ADOPTED; 2) The 10 Motion to Vacate is DENIED; and 3)The parties shall submit a further JSR by July 3, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/29/23. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-03-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/3/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-07-03 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/03/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall file their next one on August 3, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/5/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file any motion to compel by July 26, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/5/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to Compel due by 7/26/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 14 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by September 26, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/27/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
2023-07-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/26/2023 (lsj) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-09-26 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-09-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by November 27, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/26/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-09-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/27/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 09/26/2023) |
2023-10-19 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Seidell on behalf of VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (Seidell, Charles) (Entered: 10/19/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 17 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by January 29, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/28/2023. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2023-11-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 11/28/2023) |
2024-01-29 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
2024-01-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 18 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by March 29, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/29/2024. (lcjeb4) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
2024-01-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 01/29/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |