Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9760500) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 01/01/2023) |
2023-01-02 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 01/02/2023) |
2023-01-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zcb) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-01-03 | 3 | SUMMONS (3)Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 2/13/2023. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/6/23. (lcsr) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2023. (tb) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 6 , the court hereby defers the entry of a briefing schedule at this time and instead orders the parties to submit a joint status report updating the Court on the status of modifying the original FOIA request and Defendants' response to Plaintiff's FOIA request by no later than March 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/28/23. (lcsr) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 3/30/2023. (tb) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-30 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/30/2023) |
2023-04-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 7 , the court hereby defers the entry of a briefing schedule at this time and instead orders the parties to submit a joint status report updating the Court on Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request by May 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/18/23. (lcsr) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-04-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/15/2023. (tb) (Entered: 04/20/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 8 , the court hereby defers the entry of a briefing schedule at this time and instead orders the parties to submit a joint status report updating the Court on Defendant's response to Plaintiff's FOIA request by June 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/16/23. (lcsr) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2023. (tb) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report 9 , the court hereby defers the entry of a briefing schedule at this time. The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by July 30, 2023, and every 30 days thereafter, advising the court on the status of the case. To the extent that the parties propose a change in deadlines or other court action, the Report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/5/23. (lcsr) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-05 | | Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2023. (jth) (Entered: 07/08/2023) |
2023-07-28 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/28/2023) |
2023-08-28 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-09-27 | 12 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan Law)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/27/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING Plaintiff's 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's opposition to 12 Defendant's motion for summary judgment due 10/25/23. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/10/2023. (lca) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-12 | 14 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-13 | | MINUTE ORDER DISMISSING CASE: In light of the parties' 14 Stipulation of Dismissal, this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/13/2023. (lca) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-10-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Denied as Moot 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/18/2023. (ztl) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |