Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-7187823.), filed by Julio Burgos-Torres.(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2023) |
2023-01-05 | 2 | Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Local Rule 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2023.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/05/2023) |
2023-01-05 | | Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge Thomas O. Farrish added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 01/05/2023) |
2023-01-05 | 3 | Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2023 Discovery due by 7/8/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 8/12/2023 Signed by Clerk on 1/5/2023. (Barry, L) Modified on 1/6/2023 (Barry, L). (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-05 | 4 | ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/5/2023. (Barry, L) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-05 | 5 | Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/5/2023. (Barry, L) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-06 | 6 | NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 5 Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,, 1 Complaint filed by Julio Burgos-Torres, 4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 1/6/2023. (Barry, L) (Entered: 01/06/2023) |
2023-01-13 | | Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-01-17 | 7 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Matthew Hurd* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Michael William Brown* *Koch, Garg & Brown, LLP* *8 West Main Street, Suite 2-10 06357* *Niantic, CT 06388*. (Barry, L) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-06-29 | 8 | ORDER AND NOTICE. Plaintiff shall show cause on or before July 12, 2023, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to file a return of service, indicating that the complaint has been properly served. Plaintiff filed the Complaint in this case on January 5, 2023, ECF No. 1, and the Clerk issued the Summons on January 17, 2023, ECF No. 7. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) provides, in relevant part, as follows: "If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court--on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff--must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period." Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order and to file a response on or before July 11, 2023, explaining his failure to serve the Complaint within the requisite 90-day period, the case may be dismissed without further notice from the court. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 06/29/23. (Codeanne, K.) (Entered: 06/29/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 9 | MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/14/2023 Serving Complaint and Filing Return of Service by Julio Burgos-Torres. (Brown, Michael) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-10 | 10 | ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No. 9, absent objection. The court extends its condolences to counsel on his recent loss. Plaintiff shall serve the Complaint on Defendant on or before July 14, 2023, and thereafter file the requisite Return of Service. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 07/10/23. (Codeanne, K.) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 11 | AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on United States, Matthew Hurd, Christina Troiani, Adam Siple on 7/12/2023 / 7/14/2023, filed by Julio Burgos-Torres. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Nicole Elicker on behalf of Matthew Hurd (Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/13/2023 to Respond to 1 Complaint by Matthew Hurd. (Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-11 | 14 | ORDER granting ECF No. 13 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file an answer on or before September 13, 2023. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 8/11/23. (Coghlan, Katharine) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-11 | | Answer deadline updated to 9-13-2023 per Dkt. 14 Order. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-09-07 | 15 | NOTICE by Julio Burgos-Torres NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH CONSENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Brown, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2023) |
2023-09-13 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Nicole Elicker on behalf of Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration and Request to Amend Case Caption (Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-09-13 | 17 | ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses - Answer to Amended Complaint [15-1] by Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration.(Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 09/13/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by J. Brian Meskill on behalf of Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Matthew Hurd, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 19 | MOTION for Natalie N. Elicker to Withdraw as Attorney by Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Matthew Hurd, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Elicker, Natalie) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 20 | ORDER granting ECF No. 19 , Motion to Withdraw. Attorney Elicker hereby is terminated from this action. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 10/25/23. (Coghlan, Katharine) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-12-20 | 21 | PROPOSED ORDER - JOINT Proposed Scheduling Order by Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 12/20/2023) |
2024-01-02 | 22 | GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The court thanks the parties for submitting their proposed schedule, see ECF No. 21 , and hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines and procedures proposed therein. All discovery shall be completed on or before February 16, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. The parties shall submit a status report on or before March 18, 2024. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before May 17, 2024. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 1/2/2024.(Coghlan, Katharine) (Entered: 01/02/2024) |
2024-01-02 | | Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/16/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 5/17/2024; Status Report due by 3/18/2024. (Velez, Frances) (Entered: 01/03/2024) |
2024-02-12 | 23 | First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 29, 2024 for final production by Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Meskill, J. Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-02-21 | 24 | ORDER granting ECF No. 23 , Motion for Extension of Time. All discovery shall be completed on or before March 29, 2024. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 2/21/24. (Coghlan, Katharine) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
2024-02-21 | | Set Deadline: Discovery due by 3/29/2024. (Velez, F) (Entered: 02/21/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |