Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-06 | 1 | COMPLAINT against Acting FAA Administrator, Does 1 to XX, Federal Aviation Administration, Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg, Office of the Inspector Genereal, Secretary of Transportation, U.S. Department of Transportation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS142784.), filed by Raymond Bender. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint pg. 51-77, # 2 Complaint pg. 78-100, # 3 Complaint pg.101-124, # 4 Complaint pg.125-150, # 5 Complaint pg. 151-179, # 6 Complaint pg. 180- 200, # 7 Complaint pg. 201- 222, # 8 New Case Raymond v. U.S. Department of Transportation, # 9 Exhibit 1, # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3, # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 5, # 14 Exhibit 6, # 15 Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9, # 18 Exhibit 10, # 19 Exhibit 11, # 20 Exhibit 12, # 21 Exhibit 13, # 22 Exhibit 14, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Exhibit 16, # 25 Exhibit 17, # 26 Exhibit 18, # 27 Exhibit 19, # 28 Receipt) The new case number is 3:23-cv-23-LL-AHG. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Bender, Raymond)(ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-01-06 | 2 | Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (ggv) (sjt). (Entered: 01/09/2023) |
2023-02-06 | 3 | Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Acting FAA Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration, Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg, Office of the Inspector Genereal, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Morgan P. Suder, # 2 Proof of Service)(Suder, Morgan)Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party Acting FAA Administrator(pty:dft), Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party Federal Aviation Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg(pty:dft), Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party Office of the Inspector Genereal(pty:dft), Attorney Morgan Paige Suder added to party U.S. Department of Transportation(pty:dft) (ddf). (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-06 | 4 | ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion For Extension [ECF No. 3 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 2/6/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ddf) (Entered: 02/06/2023) |
2023-02-09 | 5 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Bender. Acting FAA Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration, Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg, U.S. Department of Transportation served. (ddf) (Entered: 02/09/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 6 | Notice Of Motion And Motion For Plaintiff Pro Se Ex Parte Application To File Pleadings Electronically Using CM/ECF by Raymond Bender. (ddf) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-14 | 7 | ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion For Extension [ECF No. 6 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 2/14/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ddf) (Entered: 02/14/2023) |
2023-03-15 | 8 | Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Acting FAA Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration, Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg, Office of the Inspector Genereal, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Morgan P. Suder)(Suder, Morgan) (ddf). (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 9 | ORDER Granting Ex Parte Motion For Extension [ECF No. 8 ]. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/16/2023. (ddf) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 10 | ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Linda Lopez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Andrew G. Schopler for all further proceedings. The new case number is 23cv00023-AGS-AHG. Signed by Judge Linda Lopez on 3/20/2023.(ddf) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-04-19 | 11 | MOTION to Dismiss by Acting FAA Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration, Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg, Office of the Inspector Genereal, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Suder, Morgan) (jms). (Entered: 04/19/2023) |
2023-06-06 | 12 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Raymond Paul Bender. (Attachments: # 1 RAYMOND BENDER Supporting Affidavit)(Bender, Raymond) (jms). (Entered: 06/06/2023) |
2023-06-23 | 13 | REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Acting FAA Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration, Peter Paul Montgomery Buttigieg, Office of the Inspector Genereal, U.S. Department of Transportation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Dedra Goodman)(Suder, Morgan) (jms). (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-06-26 | 14 | ORDER (AGS): The hearing previously scheduled on defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF 11 ) is vacated. The Court finds the matter suitable for disposition without oral argument. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 06/26/2023. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (no document attached) (raw) (Entered: 06/26/2023) |
2023-06-26 | 15 | REPLY - Other re 13 Reply to Response to Motion, Lodged Reply to FAA FOIA Coordinator Goodman filed by Raymond Paul Bender. (Bender, Raymond) (Entered: 06/26/2023) |
2023-11-03 | 16 | ORDER Setting Discovery Conference. Discovery conference, regarding certain discovery disputes, set for 11/27/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 11/3/2023.(hmw) (Entered: 11/03/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 17 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Discovery Conference held on 11/27/2023. The Court advised the parties that its tentative ruling would be to deny the requests for early discovery and an early ENE. Should Plaintiff choose to file a motion for early discovery or an early ENE, the motion must be filed by 1/12/2024, Defendant's opposition or notice of non-opposition must be filed by 1/26/2024, and Plaintiff's reply may be filed by 2/2/2024; the Court reserves 2/9/2024 as the hearing date for the motion, and upon completion of the briefing will alert the parties whether oral argument will be required. (Plaintiff Raymond Paul Bender, proceeding pro se ). (Defendant Attorney Morgan Paige Suder). (no document attached) (hmw) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |
|