Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-11 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9782182) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA F-2021-07013, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- Department of State)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-01-11 | 2 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. Case related to Case No. 1:22-cv-03656. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-01-12 | | Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zcb) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-01-12 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-01-12 | 4 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 12, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/12/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-13 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-27 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties to file another joint status report by May 29, 2023 proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 27, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-02-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-05-29 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 05/29/2023) |
2023-05-30 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to file another joint status report by August 28, 2023 proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 30, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-30 | 9 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Fithawi Berhane on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Derek S. Hammond (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 10 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 11 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-28 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 08/28/2023) |
2023-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file another joint status report by November 27, 2023, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 29, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/29/2023) |
2023-08-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2023 (mac) (Entered: 08/29/2023) |
2023-11-27 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
2023-11-29 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 13 Joint Status Report, to file, by February 27, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 29, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-11-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2024 (mac) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2024-02-27 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berhane, Fithawi) (Entered: 02/27/2024) |
2024-02-28 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 14 Joint Status Report, to file, by May 28, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 28, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/28/2024) |
2024-02-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/28/2024 (mac) (Entered: 02/29/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |