Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9812627) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrtw) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-25 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-02-07 | 4 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick Francescon, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9845651. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Patrick Francescon, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/07/2023) |
2023-02-10 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/27/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/26/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/03/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 2/3/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Patrick Francescon is admitted to represent Plaintiff JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. pro hac vice in this case. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/13/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-23 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2023) |
2023-02-24 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before March 24, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/24/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-27 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Francescon on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH (Francescon, Patrick) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-03-24 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-03-24 | 10 | STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 11 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by B. Kathryn Debrason on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Substituting for attorney Stephen M. DeGenaro (Debrason, B. Kathryn) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-16 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Debrason, B. Kathryn) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-05-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 24, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/17/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/24/2023 (tj) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
2023-07-24 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Debrason, B. Kathryn) (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-07-24 | 14 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH. (Francescon, Patrick); Modified on 7/26/2023 (ztth). (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-07-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/25/2023. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/25/2023) |
2023-07-26 | | NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 14 Status Report. The following error(s) need correction: Invalid attorney signature- signature on document must match PACER login. Please refile. (ztth) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-09-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 23, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/25/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-11-22 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/22/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 19 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |