Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9815032) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Dep't of Army, # 4 Summons Dep't of Defense, # 5 Summons U.S. Attorney for DC)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrtw) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 4 | STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/26/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-02-10 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 2/6/2023; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY served on 2/6/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/6/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/8/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/6/23. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by John Haberland on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Haberland, John) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 7 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion for extension of time to file answer, Dkt. 7 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer on or before May 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/1/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-05-04 | 8 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haberland, John) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before June 9, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/5/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-06-02 | 9 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Patrick Doyle on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY Substituting for attorney John Haberland (Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-06-06 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 06/06/2023) |
2023-06-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before July 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/6/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/06/2023) |
2023-07-06 | 11 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY.(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before July 28, 2023, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear by video for an Initial Scheduling Conference on August 4, 2023, at 2:30 p.m., via Zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/6/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-07-26 | 12 | STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 07/26/2023) |
2023-07-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, Dkt. 12 , the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and fees. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/27/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/27/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |