Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9815983) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Second FOIA, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 5 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons Summons -- NARA GC)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zrtw) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-01-26 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 01/26/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by March 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/2/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/02/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-03-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further status report by April 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/16/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-04-17 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 04/17/2023) |
2023-04-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further report by April 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/18/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-04-24 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 04/24/2023) |
2023-04-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another report by May 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/25/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 04/25/2023) |
2023-05-24 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-05-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further report by July 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/25/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 05/25/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 9 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 10 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-19 | 11 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sian Jones on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Derek Hammond (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 07/19/2023) |
2023-07-24 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Jones, Sian) (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-07-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by September 22, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/24/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 07/24/2023) |
2023-08-29 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Wagner on behalf of All Defendants (Wagner, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Wagner, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-09-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by October 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/25/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-10-27 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Wagner, Michael) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-10-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by December 1, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/27/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-12-01 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Wagner, Michael) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2023-12-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by January 5, 2024. If there is no stipulation of dismissal and settlement of the fees issue by then, the Court will set a prompt briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/5/2023. (lccrc2) (Entered: 12/05/2023) |
2024-01-05 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION. (Wagner, Michael) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-01-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further status report by February 5, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/8/2024. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-01-26 | 18 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 01/26/2024) |
2024-01-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 18 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/26/2024. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/26/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |