Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-01-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against the United States Coast Guard Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9690191 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Ryan Denver. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Category Form)(Peirce, Michelle) Docket text modified on 1/27/2023 (McManus, Caetlin). (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 2 | ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Angel Kelley assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 3 | Summons Issued as to United States Coast Guard. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. Farrenkopf on behalf of Ryan Denver (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-02-08 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Kanwit on behalf of United States Coast Guard (Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2023) |
2023-03-05 | 6 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Coast Guard.(Kanwit, Thomas) (Entered: 03/05/2023) |
2023-03-06 | 7 | NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: The parties are directed to consult and submit an agreed-upon pretrial schedule, as per the attached sample, no later than 7 days before the Scheduling Conference. If the Court finds parties' proposed deadlines reasonable or requires only minor adjustments, it may enter a scheduling order in lieu of holding the scheduling conference. Otherwise, Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8 (In person only) before District Judge Angel Kelley. Should the parties wish to appear by video conference and all parties assent to such change, they may reach out to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk to modify the hearing no later than two business days prior to the scheduled hearing. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 03/06/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 8 | STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule) by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-11 | 9 | Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Angel Kelley: Scheduling Conference held on 4/11/2023. Case called. Parties ordered to file joint status report no later than Friday, April 21, 2023 . (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Elizabeth R. Farrenkopf for Plaintiff; AUSA Farquhar for Gvt.) (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-04-21 | 10 | STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report and Proposed Order) by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/21/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 11 | District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. In accordance with the Court’s April 11, 2023 order [Dkt. 9], parties filed a joint status and proposed order detailing the progress of the FOIA production [Dkt. 10]. Plaintiff Denver requests that Defendant U.S. Coast Guard (“USCG”) produces responsive materials to his FOIA requests by May 11, 2023. An impending motion in Denver’s state, criminal matter—due May 18, 2023—requires use of, and reference to the requested FOIA materials. The USCG has agreed to produce some but not all responsive materials by May 11, 2023. Given the urgency of the impending motion in the criminal matter, the Court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report by Monday, May 1, 2023 , containing the following: the status of the production of written documents and radio calls, and the USCG’s detailed plan to review and produce the responsive telephone audio files, to include all benchmark deadlines needed to meet production requirements. The Court will set another status conference, with notice to issue separately. It is further ORDERED that the USCG produces all responsive written documents and radio calls by May 11, 2023 . (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 12 | ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Status Conference set for 5/5/2023 02:00 PM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before District Judge Angel Kelley. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-05-01 | 13 | STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 14 | Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Angel Kelley: Status Conference held on 5/5/2023 by video conference. Case called. The Court heard updates from the parties regarding requested documents. Further status report shall be filed on or before May 11, 2023. (Court Reporter: Linda Walsh at lwalshsteno@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Elizabeth R. Farrenkopf for Plaintiff; AUSA Farquhar for Gvt.) (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-10 | 15 | STATUS REPORT by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-26 | 16 | STATUS REPORT and Proposed Order by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/26/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 17 | District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's 16 Status Report no later than 12:00PM on Thursday, June 1, 2023. (Lara, Miguel) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-06-01 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by United States Coast Guard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-05 | 19 | STATUS REPORT & Proposed Order by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/05/2023) |
2023-06-16 | 20 | District Judge Angel Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On June 5, 2023, Denver filed a 19 status report seeking an order from the Court for outstanding documents from the USCG. Denver must file a motion to compel clearly identifying the documents believed to be outstanding, in accordance with Local Rule 37.1. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 06/16/2023) |
2023-07-17 | 21 | STATUS REPORT Joint by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-09-18 | 22 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ryan Denver. (Farrenkopf, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |