Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9871039) filed by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to FDA, # 3 Summons Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4)(Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron Siri, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9871075. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 3 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth A. Brehm, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9871076. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-17 | 4 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 02/17/2023) |
2023-02-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zcb) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice are DENIED. Given counsel's recent number of pro hac vice admissions, they should seek membership in this Court's bar. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-03-07 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION served on 2/27/2023 (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-03-07 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/27/2023. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-03-07 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2023. (Farnsworth, Colin) (Entered: 03/07/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-03-24 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-03-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 10, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/27/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/27/2023) |
2023-03-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 03/27/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Brehm on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 12 | NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Siri on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 04/10/2023) |
2023-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by May 19, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/11/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-04-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2023 (lsj) (Entered: 04/11/2023) |
2023-05-17 | 14 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. Attorney Colin M. Farnsworth terminated. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 15 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by August 1, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/19/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 05/22/2023) |
2023-08-01 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-08-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 16 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by November 1, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/01/2023) |
2023-10-31 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 10/31/2023) |
2023-10-31 | 18 | STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 10/31/2023) |
2023-11-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 18 Stipulation, the Court ORDERS that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/1/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/01/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |