Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9871621) filed by LYLE WERNER WACASER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons US Department of State, # 9 Summons USAG, # 10 Summons USAO-DC)(Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 02/20/2023) |
2023-02-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zljn) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-03-31 | 3 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Bardo, John) (Entered: 03/31/2023) |
2023-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by May 3, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/4/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-07 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/1/2023, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/1/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/1/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/31/2023.) (Sorenson, C.) (Entered: 04/07/2023) |
2023-05-03 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 05/03/2023) |
2023-05-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing scheduled, by July 5, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/4/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-07-05 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 07/05/2023) |
2023-07-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by September 5, 2023, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/6/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 07/06/2023) |
2023-09-05 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 09/05/2023) |
2023-09-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by October 5, 2023, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/6/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 09/06/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by November 6, 2023, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/6/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by January 5, 2024, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/7/2023. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/07/2023) |
2024-01-05 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 01/05/2024) |
2024-01-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by March 5, 2024, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/8/2024. (lctjk2) (Entered: 01/08/2024) |
2024-03-05 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bardo, John) (Entered: 03/05/2024) |
2024-03-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by May 6, 2024, a further joint status report, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed sooner. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/7/2024. (lctjk2) (Entered: 03/07/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |