Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-21 | 1 | COMPLAINT against United States Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27368037)Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit FOIA Response, # 3 Exhibit Responsive Record).(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 2 | CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 3 | REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Education, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-21 | 4 | RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/21/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-22 | 5 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Education..(jgo) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
2023-02-24 | 6 | SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Department of Education served on 2/24/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group..(Ranucci, Jessica) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 7 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Feldman Tarantolo on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group..(Tarantolo, Danielle) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-17 | 8 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of United States Department of Education..(Dolinger, Samuel) (Entered: 03/17/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 9 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Shanna Marie Tallarico on behalf of New York Legal Assistance Group..(Tallarico, Shanna) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-29 | 10 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Liss on behalf of United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-03-29 | 11 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/29/2023) |
2023-04-03 | 12 | ORDER: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/3/2023) (tg) Modified on 4/3/2023 (tg). (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 13 | ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to appear for a telephone conference on Tuesday, April 18, 2023, at 2:00 p.m. to discuss the status of this action. At the scheduled time, the parties shall each separately call (888) 278-0296 (or (214) 765-0479) and enter access code 6489745. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/4/2023) (kv) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-18 | 14 | ORDER: Following a telephone conference with the parties, it is hereby Ordered that the parties shall file a joint letter on May 18, 2023 setting forth the status of this action, including the productions made to date and a proposed plan for productions going forward. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/18/2023) (kl) (Entered: 04/18/2023) |
2023-04-18 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2023. (kl) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-04-25 | | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Telephone Conference held on 4/25/2023. (kl) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-18 | 15 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-05-18 | 16 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 15 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 5/18/2023) (ama) (Entered: 05/18/2023) |
2023-06-21 | 17 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-06-21 | 18 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/21/2023) (kv) (Entered: 06/21/2023) |
2023-07-21 | 19 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/21/2023) |
2023-07-21 | 20 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 19 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file another joint status report on August 21, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/21/2023) (kv) (Entered: 07/21/2023) |
2023-08-21 | 21 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | 22 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 21 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file another status update on September 21, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/22/2023) (ate) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-09-21 | 23 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda M Lee on behalf of United States Department of Education..(Lee, Amanda) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-09-21 | 24 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Lee, Amanda) (Entered: 09/21/2023) |
2023-09-22 | 25 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 24 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall file another status update by October 23, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/22/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 09/22/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 26 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Lee, Amanda) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-10-23 | 27 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 26 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall file another status update by December 7, 2023. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/23/2023) (kv) (Entered: 10/23/2023) |
2023-12-07 | 28 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Lee, Amanda) (Entered: 12/07/2023) |
2023-12-08 | 29 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 28 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall file another status update by January 31, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 12/8/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 12/08/2023) |
2024-01-31 | 30 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-01-31 | 31 | MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 30 Status Report filed by United States Department of Education. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall file another status update by March 13, 2024. SO ORDERED. Dated: January 31, 2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/31/2024) (va) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-03-13 | 32 | STATUS REPORT. Document filed by United States Department of Education..(Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/13/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |