Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-24 | 1 | COMPLAINT against SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9881436) filed by ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Proposed to AG, USAO, and Agency)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-24 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zljn) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-24 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 02/24/2023) |
2023-02-25 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of ENERGY POLICY ADVOCATES (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2023) |
2023-03-30 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Alexandra Verdi on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 03/30/2023) |
2023-03-30 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION.(Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 03/30/2023) |
2023-03-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/30/2023) |
2023-04-13 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 04/13/2023) |
2023-04-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 6 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/14/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/14/2023) |
2023-05-10 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 9, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/11/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/11/2023) |
2023-06-09 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 06/09/2023) |
2023-06-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before July 12, 2023. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall process the emails before the multi-page attachments, and shall process the emails at a rate of 500 pages per month with the first batch due on or before July 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/12/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before August 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/12/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-11 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before September 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/14/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-09-12 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/12/2023. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-10-12 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/12/2023. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-11-09 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 11/09/2023) |
2023-11-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/09/2023. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/09/2023) |
2023-12-11 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: The SEC's motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 8, 2024; Plaintiff's response and cross-motion, if any, shall be filed on or before April 5, 2024; The SEC's response, if any, and reply shall be filed on or before May 3, 2024; and Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross motion, if any, shall be filed on or before May 31, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/12/2023. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2024-03-08 | 15 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Lizzette Katilius, # 3 Declaration of Elizabeth Murphy, # 4 Declaration of Ann Chilton, # 5 Declaration of Peter Bartolino, # 6 Declaration of Mark Tallarico, # 7 Exhibit 1 (Vaughn Index), # 8 Memorandum in Support, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Verdi, Mary) (Entered: 03/08/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |