Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-02-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9887013) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons USDA Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty Summons, # 5 Supplement Exhibit List, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 6)(Bartkowski, Paul) (Entered: 02/27/2023) |
2023-02-28 | | Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zcb) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-04-06 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/06/2023) |
2023-04-14 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/14/2023) |
2023-04-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file, by May 8, 2023, a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 4/17/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 04/17/2023) |
2023-04-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 5/8/2023. (zkh) (Entered: 04/17/2023) |
2023-05-08 | 5 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/08/2023) |
2023-05-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by July 7, 2023, a further joint status report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 5/9/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 05/09/2023) |
2023-07-14 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Leave to File JOINT STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/14/2023) |
2023-07-17 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' 6 Motion for Leave to File Joint Status Report. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Motion for Leave to File Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, by September 8, a further joint status report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/17/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 07/17/2023) |
2023-09-06 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/06/2023) |
2023-09-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by November 15, 2023, a further joint status report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/12/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/12/2023) |
2023-11-14 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2023-11-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by January 15, 2024, a further joint status report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/15/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 11/15/2023) |
2024-01-11 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/11/2024) |
2024-01-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by March 15, 2024, a further joint status report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 1/12/2024. (lctjk3) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
2024-01-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2024. (zkh) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |