Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-03-01 | 1 | COMPLAINT against JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9893156) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Nobile, T. Russell) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-01 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 03/01/2023) |
2023-03-15 | 3 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/13/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/12/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/8/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/8/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Nobile, T. Russell) (Entered: 03/15/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 6 | ORDER: Local Rule 16.3(b)(10) exempts parties to a FOIA action from typical scheduling order requirements. Instead, the government has the burden to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting dispositive motion. The Court therefore ORDERS the government to file the index and supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/12/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional joint status report by 9/11/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/13/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/13/2023) |
2023-09-11 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/11/2023) |
2023-09-25 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional joint status report by 11/13/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/25/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 09/25/2023) |
2023-11-13 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/13/2023) |
2023-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional joint status report by 1/12/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/14/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2024-01-12 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
2024-01-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit an additional joint status report by 3/13/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/12/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/12/2024) |
2024-03-13 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 03/13/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |