Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-03-03 | 1 | COMPLAINT against INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9901071) filed by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit I to the Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit II to the Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ABBVIE INC. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 03/03/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 4 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert H. Albaral, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9916127. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Robert H. Albaral, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 5 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel A. Rosen, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9916137. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel A. Rosen, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-09 | 6 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brendan J. Sponheimer, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9916144. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ABBVIE INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Brendan J. Sponheimer, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/6/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/5/2023. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 3/6/2023 (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert H. Albaral is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/14/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel A. Rosen is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/14/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Brendan J. Sponheimer is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/14/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-03-16 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/10/2023. (Clarke, George) (Entered: 03/16/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Albaral on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Albaral, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rosen on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Rosen, Daniel) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 12 | ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Rosen on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Rosen, Daniel) Modified on 3/21/2023 correctly filed at entry 13 (zjm). (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-03-20 | 13 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Sponheimer on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Sponheimer, Brendan) (Entered: 03/20/2023) |
2023-04-03 | 14 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 04/03/2023) |
2023-04-04 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline to answer or otherwise to plead to shall be extended to May 26, 2023. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/04/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-05-26 | 15 | ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE.(Hunsader, Joseph) (Entered: 05/26/2023) |
2023-06-09 | 16 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before June 23, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/09/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/09/2023) |
2023-06-23 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ABBVIE INC.. (Sponheimer, Brendan) (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-06-23 | 18 | NOTICE of Appearance by Vivek Patel on behalf of ABBVIE INC. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 06/23/2023) |
2023-06-26 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by August 4, 2023, updating the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/26/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/26/2023) |
2023-08-04 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ABBVIE INC.. (Sponheimer, Brendan) (Entered: 08/04/2023) |
2023-08-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 18, 2023, updating the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/07/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/07/2023) |
2023-09-18 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ABBVIE INC.. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 09/18/2023) |
2023-09-20 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 17, 2023, updating the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/20/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 09/20/2023) |
2023-11-17 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ABBVIE INC.. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 11/17/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 16, 2024, updating the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/21/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2024-01-16 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by ABBVIE INC.. (Patel, Vivek) (Entered: 01/16/2024) |
2024-01-21 | | MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 15, 2024, updating the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/21/2024. (lcapm3) (Entered: 01/21/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |