Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10050521) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Agency, # 3 Summons Summons for AG, # 4 Summons Summons for USATTY DC)(Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-05 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrtw) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-05 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 05/05/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 4 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Summons for Agency)(Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-05-15 | 5 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 15, 2023. (lccjn2) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
2023-05-16 | 6 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (zed) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2024-01-25 | 7 | NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 01/25/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |