Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-04 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10046821) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA F-2023-05435, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - FOIA F-2023-05440, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - FOIA F-2023-05441, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney's Office, # 6 Summons Summons - U.S. Attorney General, # 7 Summons Summons - State Department)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-04 | | Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-04 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 05/04/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by M. Jared Littman on behalf of All Defendants (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 4 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Littman, M.) (Entered: 05/30/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 5 | ORDER granting Motion 4 for Extension of Time to Respond. Response due by 07/07/2023. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/31/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-05-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/7/2023. (zsmc) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 7 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam Escher on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney M. Jared Littman (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-11 | 8 | ORDER: Local Rule 16.3(b)(10) exempts parties to a FOIA action from typical scheduling order requirements. Instead, the government has the burden to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting dispositive motion. The Court therefore ORDERS the government to file the index and supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/11/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 9 | NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-07-12 | 10 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023) |
2023-08-10 | 11 | Consent MOTION to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and File a Joint Status Report Every 60 Days Instead by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam). Added MOTION for Leave to File on 8/15/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 08/10/2023) |
2023-08-14 | 12 | ORDER granting Motion 11 to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and File a Joint Status Report Every 60 Days Instead. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/14/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 08/14/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 12/12/2023. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/17/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 10/17/2023) |
2023-12-12 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/12/2023) |
2023-12-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 2/13/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/13/2023. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 12/13/2023) |
2024-02-12 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/12/2024) |
2024-02-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report by 5/14/2024. SO ORDERED by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/15/2024. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/15/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |