Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-09 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ARMY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10056992) filed by ALLAN G. JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 05/09/2023) |
2023-05-10 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-10 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-16 | 3 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/23. (DM) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-05-31 | 4 | NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Doyle on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY (Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-06-02 | 5 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-06-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant indicates that this FOIA matter may resolve in the near future without court intervention. As such, Defendant requests an extension of time, from June 9, 2023 to August 4, 2023, to answer. As Plaintiff consents, and upon good cause shown, Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED . Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before August 4, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 2, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-06-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs complaint on or before 8/4/2023. (dot) (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-08-03 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY.(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 08/03/2023) |
2023-08-06 | 7 | ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before September 1, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 4, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 08/06/2023) |
2023-08-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2023. (dot) (Entered: 08/07/2023) |
2023-09-01 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/01/2023) |
2023-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 24, 2023 and, if necessary, another joint status report every ninety days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 1, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 09/01/2023) |
2023-09-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/24/2023 and, if necessary, another joint status report every ninety days thereafter. (dot) (Entered: 09/05/2023) |
2023-09-07 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of ALLAN G. JOHNSON (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/07/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. In its motion, Defendant requests the Court to extend the deadline for the parties' next joint status report from November 24 to November 29, 2023. As the parties consent, and upon good cause shown, the Court shall GRANT Defendant's 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their joint status report on or before November 29, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 21, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2023. (dot) (Entered: 11/21/2023) |
2023-11-29 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2023) |
2023-12-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' suggestion in their 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 15, 2023 , updating the Court on the status of their efforts regarding the records at issue in this case, and, if necessary, every sixty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 1, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/01/2023) |
2023-12-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2023, updating the Court on the status of their efforts regarding the records at issue in this case, and, if necessary, every sixty days thereafter. (dot) (Entered: 12/11/2023) |
2023-12-15 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 12/15/2023) |
2024-01-31 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doyle, Patrick) (Entered: 01/31/2024) |
2024-03-14 | 14 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by ALLAN G. JOHNSON. (Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 03/14/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |