Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-10 | 1 | COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10059563) filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons on U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons on U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-10 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-10 | | Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-10 | 3 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
2023-05-11 | 4 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 11, 2023. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/11/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder on behalf of WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Kutnik-Bauder, Jacqueline) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/12/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/11/2023. (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-19 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/19/23. (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/19/2023) |
2023-05-23 | 8 | MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James D. Friedland, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10086895. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
2023-05-23 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of James D. Friedland. Mr. Friedland may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing plaintiff in this action. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 23, 2023. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
2023-05-24 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Friedland on behalf of WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Friedland, James) (Entered: 05/24/2023) |
2023-06-01 | 10 | NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hart on behalf of WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Hart, Margaret) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-02 | | RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hart on behalf of WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS (Hart, Margaret). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 6/9/2023. (zbaj) Modified on 6/14/2023 (zbaj). (Entered: 06/02/2023) |
2023-06-08 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2023) |
2023-06-08 | 12 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2023) |
2023-06-08 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and DIRECTING defendant to respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by July 12, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 8, 2023. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/08/2023) |
2023-06-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 7/12/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 06/09/2023) |
2023-07-07 | 13 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 07/07/2023) |
2023-07-10 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 13 Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, and DIRECTING defendant to respond to plaintiff's 1 Complaint by August 11, 2023. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 10, 2023. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/10/2023) |
2023-07-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/11/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 07/11/2023) |
2023-08-11 | 14 | Partial MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative , Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Baime Declaration, # 4 Lilly Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2023) |
2023-08-18 | 15 | Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 Partial MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 08/18/2023) |
2023-08-21 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING plaintiff's 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply and DIRECTING the parties to adhere to the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by September 29, 2023, the plaintiff shall file any response to the defendants 14 Partial Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative , for Partial Summary Judgment, and (2) by October 30, 2023, the defendant shall file any reply. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 21, 2023. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/21/2023) |
2023-08-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff To The Defendant's 14 Partial Motion to Dismiss, in the alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment due by 9/29/2023. Defendant Reply due by 10/30/2023. (mac) (Entered: 08/22/2023) |
2023-09-05 | 16 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. Attorney Jacqueline Kutnik-Bauder terminated. (Kutnik-Bauder, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/05/2023) |
2023-09-29 | 17 | Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Motion to Dismiss,, Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Margaret Hart, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 09/29/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 18 | MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2023-10-26 | | MINUTE ORDER (paperless), upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, DIRECTING the parties to file, by January 19, 2024, another joint status report advising the Court of the status of this matter and proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 26, 2023. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-10-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 1/19/2024 (mac) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 19 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 Partial MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Further Statement of Material Facts)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-12-29 | 20 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. Attorney Kevin H. Metz terminated. (Metz, Kevin) (Entered: 12/29/2023) |
2024-01-19 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Friedland, James) (Entered: 01/19/2024) |
2024-03-10 | 22 | ORDER GRANTING the defendant's 14 Partial Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 10, 2024. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/10/2024) |
2024-03-10 | 23 | MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendant's 14 Partial Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, For Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 10, 2024. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/10/2024) |
2024-03-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2024. (mac) (Entered: 03/11/2024) |
2024-03-12 | 24 | CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant against Plaintiff.Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on 03/12/24. (mac) (Entered: 03/12/2024) |
Hide Docket Events |