Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-05-11 | 1 | PETITION against The United States (). Filed by David Rowland Manuel. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Envelope)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-11 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Proposed Order filed by David Rowland Manuel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-11 | 3 | Motion for Priority of case filed by David Rowland Manuel. Responses due by 5/25/2023. Replies due by 6/1/2023. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-11 | 4 | Certificate of Interested Entities by David Rowland Manuel (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2023) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 5 | Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2023 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-16 | 6 | ORDER SCREENING COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. The 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The 3 Motion for Priority is denied. Amended Complaint due by 6/23/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 05/16/2023) |
2023-05-30 | 7 | Mail sent to David Manuel returned as undeliverable re 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2023) (Entered: 05/31/2023) |
2023-08-09 | 8 | CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Case Management Conference: Notice is hereby given that the Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 1:30 PM is vacated and may be reset for a later date, if necessary. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/09/2023) |
2023-08-15 | 9 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 9/11/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/15/2023. (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2023) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (Entered: 08/15/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |