Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJonathan Corbett v. U.S. Transportation Security Administration
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2022cv06920
Date Filed2022-09-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dolly M. Gee
PlaintiffJonathan Corbett
Case DescriptionJonathan Corbett, an attorney, submitted three FOIA requests to the Transportation Security Administration for records. His first request asked for records concerning the cost of a TSA software development project. The second request asked for records concerning a security breach by TSA employees several days prior to his request. The third request asked for records concerning another security breach by TSA employees. The agency acknowledged receipt of all three requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Corbett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. Transportation Security Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-09-251COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34044627 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Corbett. (Attorney Jonathan W Corbett added to party Jonathan Corbett(pty:pla))(Corbett, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2022)
2022-09-252CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Corbett. (Corbett, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2022)
2022-09-253Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Corbett. (Corbett, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/25/2022)
2022-09-264NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-265NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-266Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-267NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 3 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect days for defendant to serve a response on Plaintiff entered. If the case is filed under the Freedom of Information Act, "Within 30 days" should be reflected on summons. Clerk has attached proper FOIA Summons for filer as a courtesy. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (Attachments: # 1 Courtesy FOIA Summons Request) (lh) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-268Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Corbett. (Corbett, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/26/2022)
2022-09-28930-Day Summons Issued re Complaint 1 as to Defendant U.S. Transportation Security Administration. (gk) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-09-2910INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-2711STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant U.S. Transportation Security Administration.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party U.S. Transportation Security Administration(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-2812ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant U.S. Transportation Security Administration.(Attorney Jennifer R. Jacobs added to party U.S. Transportation Security Administration(pty:dft))(Jacobs, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-2913SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/30/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2023 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 11/29/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar