Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv07058
Date Filed2019-07-29
Date Closed2021-03-10
JudgeJudge George B. Daniels
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project
Case DescriptionThe ACLU Immigrant Rights Project submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning data on removals, detentions, ICE arrests/apprehensions, ICE risk classifications, and immigration bonds. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the ACLU that its request was too broad and asked if it would restrict its time frame to the last seven years. The ACLU agreed to make that clarification, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
AppealSecond Circuit 21-1233
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [43]
Opinion/Order [45]
Opinion/Order [52]
Opinion/Order [53]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in New York has ruled that U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is not required to insert a unique identifier in place of Alien file numbers contained in data requested by the ACLU Immigrants' Rights Project concerning immigration apprehensions, detentions, removals, risk classification assessments, and bond management information because it would require the agency to create a new record. The agency disclosed 40 spreadsheet tabs containing over one million rows of data covering the years 2012 to 2019. However, it did not provide the unique identifiers requested by the ACLU because it did have a computer program that would allow it to replace A-numbers with unique identifiers. Judge George Daniels pointed out that two provisions of FOIA were at issue here " a requirement that agencies produce records in the format of the requester's choice as long as doing so would be "readily reproducible." The other provision was contained in the 2016 FOIA Improvement Act concerning segregability, requiring agencies to consider partial disclosure where full disclosure was not possible and to take reasonable steps necessary to segregate and release non-exempt information. Here, the ACLU argued that ICE was required to "'replace A-numbers with Unique IDs' because ICE can segregate out Unique IDs (nonexempt information) from A-numbers (exempt information) using nonburdensome computer software." In contrast, ICE argued that doing so would require creation of a record. The ACLU asserted that "one of the functions of A-numbers is to convey 'Relational Information' " information which shows the records are associated with particular individuals." The ACLU argued that FOIA required ICE to run Structured Query Language searches that would separate out this non-exempt Relational Information. Daniels pointed out that "but ICE does not maintain 'Relational Information' or 'unique identifiers' in its databases. These extrapolated data points are simply not something that ICE 'has in fact chosen to create and retain.' 'Relational Information' and 'Unique IDs' are not preexisting data fields (e.g. date, category, or title) in the [Integrated Decision Support System] database which ICE can sort. The ACLU's request for 'Unique IDs' or 'Relational Information' does not seek the contents of the database (such as A-numbers), but instead seemingly seeks information about those contents. As such it is a request that requires the creation of a new record." He added that "however, 'Relational Information' or Unique IDs cannot be 'apparent on the face of the database' because they are conceptual abstractions, not datapoints within the IIDS." Daniels also rejected the ACLU's form or format argument. Citing Sai v. Transportation Security Administration, 466 F. Supp. 3d 35 (D.D.C. 2020), Daniels indicated that "form" referred to the media " such as paper or thumb drive " while "format" referred to the electronic structure for the processing, storage, or display of data " such as PDF or JPEG. Applying these definitions here, he pointed out that "ICE is correct, the ACLU's request does not implicate format (i.e. file types). Instead, the ACLU seeks to have ICE transform A-numbers into Unique IDs. Such a request is not the purpose of this section of the FOIA."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to State a Claim, Choice of format - Burdensome
User-contributed Documents
 031 ICE Memo MSJ
032 Vassilio-Diaz Decl
034 Pl Memo Cross MSJ
035 Hausman Decl + Exhibits A-F
036 Wu Decl + Exhibit A
039 Govt Reply Memo in Supp of MSJ
040 Vassilio-Diaz Supp Decl
041 Pl Reply Memo in Supp MSJ
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-07-291COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17330641)Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - ACLU and FOIA Correspondence)(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-292CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-293REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-294RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project.(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-30CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (dnh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (dnh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-305ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-306NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Elizabeth Anne Molino Sauvigne on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project (Sauvigne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-307MOTION for Michael King Thomas Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17338402. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael Tan, # 2 Supplement, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Tan, Michael) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-30>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 7 MOTION for Michael King Thomas Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17338402. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-308AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (FOIA CASE). United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service was made by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-319INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been designated an electronic case and has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. An Initial pretrial conference will be held on Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 11A. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/31/2019) (ama) (Main Document 9 replaced on 8/7/2019) (kv). (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-0110ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 7 Motion for Michael King Thomas Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/1/2019) (rro) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0111NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Thomas Tan on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Tan, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0812AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement dated August 7, 2019 (attached as Exhibit A), Initial Pretrial Conference Order signed July 31, 2019, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions, Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge James L. Cott and Individual Rules and Practices of Judge George B. Daniels on August 7, 2019. Service was made by Certified Mail. Return Receipt Requested. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Sauvigne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-1313NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tomoko Onozawa on behalf of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-2814LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from AUSA Tomoko Onozawa dated 8/28/2019 re: request to extend Defendant's time to respond to complaint and to adjourn initial conference. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-09-0315MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 14 Letter re: request to extend Defendant's time to respond to complaint and to adjourn initial conference., filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.,ENDORSEMENT: The initial conference is adjourned from September 5, 2019 to October 24, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 9/30/2019., Initial Conference set for 10/24/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2019) (rj) (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-3016ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Onozawa, Tomoko) (Entered: 09/30/2019)
2019-10-24Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/24/2019, ( Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels.). Plaintiff Counsel: Elizabeth Anne Molino Sauvigne; Defense Counsel: Tomoko Onozawa and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2020-01-1317NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Zachary Bannon on behalf of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1318PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1519MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 18 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 3/27/2020. Cross Motions due by 5/26/2020. Responses due by 6/16/2020. Replies due by 7/7/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/15/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-16Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2020. Plaintiff Counsel: Elizabeth Anne Molino Sauvigne Defense Counsel: Zachary Bannon amd Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-2120ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement), Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/16/2020) (rj) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-2221ORDER: By Order of Reference dated January 16, 2020 (Dkt. No. 20), Judge Daniels referred this FOIA case to me for general pretrial supervision, including settlement. The Court will hold a telephone conference on February 6, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. to discuss what role the Court can play to facilitate settlement, including by helping to narrow or resolve any outstanding issues in advance of the scheduled motion practice. Counsel should contact chambers at (212) 805-0250 with both sides on the line, or alternatively provide a call-in number to the Court by emailing it to CottNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 1/22/2020) (mro) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-02-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Telephone Conference held on 2/6/2020. (Tam, David) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-0622ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: By Order of Reference dated January 16, 2020 (Dkt. No. 20), Judge Daniels referred this FOIA case to me for settlement. The parties and the Court conferred, and agreed that the conference will be held before me on February 27, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (And as further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/6/2020) (jca) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-1123PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-1224MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 23 Proposed Scheduling Order filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Cross Motions due by 6/26/2020., Motions due by 4/27/2020. Responses due by 7/17/2020. Replies due by 8/7/2020. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/12/2020) (ama) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-2625NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by Eric Riedel on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project.(Riedel, Eric) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Settlement Conference held on 2/27/2020. (Tam, David) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-2726ORDER: The Court held a settlement conference today, at which the parties agreed to continue their settlement efforts. As discussed, the Court will hold a telephone conference on March 16, 2020 at 11:30 a.m., during which the parties will provide a status report. Counsel should contact chambers at (212) 805-0250 with both sides on the line, or alternatively provide a call-in number to the Court by emailing it to CottNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED. (Telephone Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 2/27/2020) (jca) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-03-0227NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by George Abraham Zimmerman on behalf of American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York, 10001-8602,..(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 03/02/2020)
2020-03-16Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Telephone Conference held on 3/16/2020. (ml) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-2728PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-3029STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties as follows: 1. The Parties agree that arguments asserted during the summary judgment phase of the above-captioned action shall be limited to the issue of Unique Identifiers in place of A-numbers, as requested by Plaintiff in the FOIA Request (see Dkt. No. 1-1 ), and as further set forth in this stipulation.The Parties further agree that the summary judgment briefing schedule and page limits shall be amended to the following: By May 7, 2020, Defendant will file its motion for summary judgment, with a brief not longer than 20 pages. By June 18, 2020, Plaintiff will file a single brief not longer than 30 pages in support of its cross-motion and in opposition to Defendant's motion. By July 9, 2020, Defendant will file a single brief not longer than 20 pages in opposition to Plaintiffs cross-motion and in reply in support of its own motion. By July 30, 2020, Plaintiff will file their reply brief not longer than 10 pages in support of its cross-motion. (Motions due by 5/7/2020. Cross Motions due by 6/18/2020. Responses due by 7/9/2020. Replies due by 7/30/2020.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/30/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-05-0730MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-0731MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-05-0732DECLARATION of Donna Vassilio-Diaz in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A).(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 05/07/2020)
2020-06-1833CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-1834MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 33 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-1835DECLARATION of Eugene Hausman in Support re: 33 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B NYT Data Excerpt, # 3 Exhibit C HRW Data Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit D TRAC Data Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit E ICE Response Letter, # 6 Exhibit F Immigration Bond Form).(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-1836DECLARATION of Eugene Wu in Support re: 33 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Curriculum Vitae).(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-2937LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Zachary Bannon dated 6/29/2020. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-2938ORDER granting 37 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 37 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Zachary Bannon dated 6/29/2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/29/2020) Responses due by 7/16/2020 Replies due by 8/13/2020. (ks) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-07-1639REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-1640DECLARATION of Donna Vassilio-Diaz in Support re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-08-1341REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 33 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Zimmerman, George) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1342LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Eric J. Riedel dated August 13, 2020 re: Request for Oral Argument on Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Riedel, Eric) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1743ORDER: This Court will hear oral argument on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 30), and Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 33), on December 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/17/2020) ( Oral Argument set for 12/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (ks) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-11-3044LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Eric J. Riedel dated November 30, 2020 re: respectfully requesting that Your Honor hold Oral Argument remotely. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Riedel, Eric) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-0245ORDER: The oral argument scheduled for December 3, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. shall occur as a videoconference using the Skype platform. To optimize the quality of the video feed, only the Court, Plaintiff's counsel, Movant' s counsel, and Defendants' counsel will appear by video for the proceeding; all others will participate by telephone. Due to the limited capacity of the Skype system, only one counsel per party may participate. Co-counsel, members of the press, and the public may access the audio feed of the conference by calling (917) 933-2166 and entering the conference ID 225540242, and as further set forth in this order. (Telephone Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/2/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels: Oral Argument held on 12/3/2020 re: 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, 33 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. Plaintiff's Counsel: Eric Riedel; Defense Counsel: Zachary Bannon and Court Reporter present. (Vega, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-3046NOTICE of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1).(Bannon, Zachary) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-0647TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/3/2020 before Judge George B. Daniels. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/27/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-0648NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/3/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-1349MOTION for Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Sauvigne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-1350DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne in Support re: 49 MOTION for Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project..(Sauvigne, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-1951ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Elizabeth A. Molino Sauvigne's motion to withdraw her appearance as counsel for Plaintiff American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project is GRANTED. (Attorney Elizabeth Anne Molino Sauvigne terminated.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/14/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-03-1052MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant's motion for summary judgment dismissing Plaintiffs claims, (ECF No. 30), is GRANTED. Plaintiff's cross-motion, (ECF No. 33), is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions accordingly.. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/10/2021) (ks) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-1053CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 52 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. in favor of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement against American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Rights Project. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Decision and Order dated March 10, 2021, Defendant's motion for summary judgment dismissing Plaintiff's claims (ECF No. 30), is granted; Plaintiff's cross-motion, (ECF No. 33), is denied. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/10/2021) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-10Terminate Transcript Deadlines (dt) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar