Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00035
Date Filed2021-01-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-071COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8047923) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-20, # 3 Exhibit 21-30, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-072NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-073NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-07Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-074SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-115STANDING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall comply with the directives set forth in the attached standing order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/11/2021. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar