Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNightingale et al v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2019cv03512
Date Filed2019-06-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William H. Orrick
PlaintiffZachary Nightingale
PlaintiffCourtney McDermed
PlaintiffCheryl David
PlaintiffPao Lopa
PlaintiffMaribel Carandang
Case DescriptionImmigration attorneys Zachary Nightingale, Courtney McDermed, and Cheryl David submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for alien files on behalf of their clients. Non-citizens Pao Lopa and Maribel Carandano submitted FOIA requests for their alien files. After the agency failed to respond, the requesters filed a class action suit against U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and the Department of Homeland Security for the agencies' routine failure to provide alien files within the statutory time limit for responding.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Jurisdiction - Injunction, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
AppealNinth Circuit 21-15288
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [47]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California has certified a group of three immigration attorneys and two non-citizens to represent the class of frequent FOIA requesters bringing a pattern or practice claim against the Department of Homeland Security for the failure of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement to provide Alien files within the statutory time limit under FOIA. One contributor to the agency's backlog in responding to requests for A-Files is its policy of referring portions of A-Files to ICE for review. Judge William Orrick agreed that the five representatives of the class had met the four factors �" numerosity, commonality, typicality, and adequacy �" under Rule 23(a) for certification as a class. Addressing the issue of numerosity, Orrick noted that "plaintiffs provide various declarations of immigration attorneys that show at least 173 A-File FOIA requests filed on behalf of noncitizens have been pending with USCIS for more than 30 business days without a determination, and at least 139 A-File FOIA requests that USCIS has referred to ICE and have been pending for more than 30 business days. Plaintiffs also point to the backlogs reported by DHS as evidence that defendants know the exact number of class members who have not received a timely determination." On the issue of commonality, Orrick explained that in Hajro v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, 811 F.3d 1086 (9th Cir. 2016), the Ninth Circuit had recognized a pattern or practice claim for failure to respond within the statutory time limits, but had sympathized with plaintiffs whose challenges often became moot once the agency had responded to their individual requests. DHS argued that the class representatives represented only an aggregation of individuals challenging the way in which their A-File requests were being processed. Orrick disagreed, noting instead that "this argument rests upon a misunderstanding of plaintiffs' claims, which do not relate to the delay in any particular A-File FOIA request but instead to defendants' 'widespread practice of failing to make a determination within FOIA's statutory time frame' that can be resolved in a 'single stroke.' Plaintiffs have established commonality because the shared injury between plaintiffs and proposed class members is the delayed receipt of determination on their A-File FOIA requests filed with USCIS, and, with respect to the ICE Referral class, subsequently referred by USCIS to ICE. This delayed receipt is the result of defendants' alleged pattern and practice of failing to make determinations in A-File FOIA cases within the statutorily mandated time frame, making it the common contention, or the 'glue' that holds each class member together." Addressing the issue of typicality, Orrick observed that "here, plaintiffs and proposed class members have filed or will file A-File FOIA requests to defendants who are required to make timely determinations pursuant to the timeframe set forth in [FOIA]. Thus, plaintiffs seek the same relief that members of the proposed class would seek: the timely determination of their A-File FOIA requests." On the issue of adequacy, Orrick pointed out that "both plaintiffs and proposed class members have a shared interest in ensuring that defendants make determinations in response to their A-File FOIA requests within the statutory time period." Orrick also found the proposed class would represent the interests of the larger class. He observed that "plaintiffs do not seek relief with respect to the determination made on individual A-File FOIA requests. They 'challenge Defendants' pattern or practice of refusing to timely make such determinations.' Plaintiffs' pattern or practice claim is 'central to the claims of all class members irrespective of their individual circumstances and the disparate effects of the conduct.' Certification, therefore, does not hinge on the complexities of each A-File requested but rather on the uniform untimeliness in responding to A-File FOIA requests."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Standing
User-contributed Documents
 001 Complaint
047 Order Granting Class Cert.
068-5 Plaintiff's Redacted Notice of Motion, MSJ
089 Order Grant. Motion to Seal; Plaint. Decl. Injunct. Relief
097 Defendant's Compliance Report
104 Defendant's Compliance Report 2
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13449903.). Filed byZachary Nightingale, Pao Lopa, Cheryl David, Courtney McDermed, Maribel Carandang. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-192Civil Cover Sheet by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale . (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-193Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-194Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-195Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-196Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-197Proposed Summons. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-198NOTICE of Appearance by Stacy Eva Tolchin as co-counsel (Tolchin, Stacy) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-199Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/3/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2019) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-2010Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2011Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019) (Entered: 06/20/2019)
2019-06-2812CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/19/2019 is reset to 10/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0113CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale.. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0114CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0215CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Motion to Relate Cases (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0216ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/19. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0317AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and case initiating documents served on Defendants, Attorney General William Barr, and US Attorney's Office for the Northern District of California on June 25, 2019, filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 7/3/2019) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0818CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/08/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-0819CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale of Case Management Conference Order and Judge Orrick's Standing Order for Civil Cases (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 7/8/2019) (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-2320MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13543976.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Kang, Leila) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2321MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13545417.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 7/23/2019) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
2019-07-2922Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Leila Kang. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-2923Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Matt Adams. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-3024NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 7/30/2019) (Entered: 07/30/2019)
2019-07-3125ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 7/31/2019) Modified on 8/1/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-0226MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13575738.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Kenney, Mary) (Filed on 8/2/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-0527MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13581757.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Creighton, Emily) (Filed on 8/5/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (aaa, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2019)
2019-08-0828MOTION to Certify Class filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/22/2019. Replies due by 8/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Declaration First Realmuto Dec., # 3 Declaration Nightingale Dec. and attachment, # 4 Declaration David Dec., # 5 Declaration McDermed Dec., # 6 Declaration Abrutyn Dec., # 7 Declaration Cleveland Dec., # 8 Declaration Hall Dec., # 9 Declaration Asch Dec., # 10 Declaration Taurel Dec. and attachment, # 11 Declaration Ellison Dec., # 12 Declaration Hansen Dec., # 13 Declaration Lee Dec., # 14 Declaration Falgout Dec., # 15 Declaration Dobrin Dec. and attachments, # 16 Declaration Phelps Dec., # 17 Declaration Second Realmuto Dec., # 18 Declaration Kenney Dec., # 19 Declaration Adams Dec., # 20 Declaration Tolchin Dec., # 21 Exhibit Lopa FOIA Status Check, # 22 Exhibit Carandang FOIA Status Check, # 23 Proposed Order)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 8/8/2019) (Entered: 08/08/2019)
2019-08-1529MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13613235.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Valenzuela, Claudia) (Filed on 8/15/2019) Modified on 8/16/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-1530MOTION to Continue Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 8/15/2019) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-1931OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 30 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) filed byMaribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Third Realmuto Dec.)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/19/2019)
2019-08-2232ORDER GRANTING 30 MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' 28 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION - Response due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/22/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-2933ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 8/29/2019) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-2934ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 8/29/2019) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-09-0335JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER ; filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/3/2019) Modified on 9/4/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/03/2019)
2019-09-0536OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jill A. Eggleston, # 2 Declaration of Toni Fuentes)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 9/5/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)
2019-09-0637CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference continued to 10/2/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor (to coincide with motion hearing). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019) (Entered: 09/06/2019)
2019-09-0938Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Emily J. Creighton. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-0939Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Claudia Valenzuela. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-0940Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kenney. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019) (Entered: 09/09/2019)
2019-09-1141CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING - Hearing as to 28 MOTION to Certify Class and Initial Case Management Conference reset for 10/1/2019 03:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2019) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-1242REPLY (re 28 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byMaribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/12/2019) (Entered: 09/12/2019)
2019-10-0143Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2019 re 28 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion taken under submission; written order to follow. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2020. Total Time in Court: 36 minutes. Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2019) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-0744TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/1/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Kang, Leila) (Filed on 10/7/2019) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-0945TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/01/2019 before Judge William H. Orrick by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 10/9/2019) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-1146Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/01/19, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 45 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2020. (Related documents(s) 45 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-1547ORDER GRANTING CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge William H. Orrick granting 28 Motion to Certify Class. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-1748CORRECTED Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/1/19, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 45 Transcript Order, 44 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2020. (Related documents(s) 45 , 44 ) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019) (Entered: 10/17/2019)
2019-12-1049MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 12/24/2019. Replies due by 12/31/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kang, Leila) (Filed on 12/10/2019) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2020-01-1350Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Leila Kang. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1451CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defs' Response to Pls First Set of ROGs, # 2 Exhibit Defs' Response to Pls First Set of RFPs)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-1552NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha S. Edney (Edney, Marsha) (Filed on 1/15/2020) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-01-2153Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2020. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. FTR Time: 2:15-2:22. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2020) Modified on 5/15/2020: Matter transcribed by Marla Knox. (rjdS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-2054Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 3/5/2020. Replies due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 2/20/2020) (Entered: 02/20/2020)
2020-03-0655ORDER RE: CHANGES TO 54 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/06/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)
2020-03-1856PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge William H. Orrick granting 54 Motion for Protective Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-04-3057Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-0558Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-0559NOTICE of Change of Address by Trina Ann Realmuto (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 5/5/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-1560TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/21/2020 before Judge William H. Orrick by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-2261Transcript of Electronic Proceedings held on January 21, 2020, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 60 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2020. (Related documents(s) 60 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
2020-06-0262NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary A Kenney (Kenney, Mary) (Filed on 6/2/2020) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-08-0763STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Stipulated Deposition Protocol filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-1064Order for Entry of Stipulated Deposition Protocol by Judge William H. Orrick re: 63 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-1865NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Matthew Charles Skurnik (Skurnik, Matthew) (Filed on 8/18/2020) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-09-1866MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14958153.) filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing - WA State, # 2 Certificate of Admission to U.S. District Court, S.D. Texas)(Lieu, Tiffany) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-2767Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany Lieu. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2020) (Entered: 09/27/2020)
2020-09-3068Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Version of Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order (Redacted), # 4 Proposed Order (Unredacted), # 5 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Redacted Version of Index of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Unredacted Version of Index of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-3069EXHIBITS re 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byMaribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit O, # 5 Exhibit Q, # 6 Exhibit R, # 7 Exhibit S, # 8 Exhibit V, # 9 Exhibit W, # 10 Exhibit X, # 11 Exhibit AA, # 12 Exhibit BB, # 13 Exhibit FF, # 14 Exhibit GG)(Related document(s) 68 ) (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-3070MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 10/21/2020. Replies due by 11/4/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Redacted Index of Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-3071Declaration of Trina Realmuto in Support of 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 69 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byMaribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Zachary Nightingale (Supplemental), # 2 Declaration Matthew Hoppock, # 3 Declaration Laura St. John, # 4 Declaration Andrea Saenz, # 5 Declaration Sabrina Damast, # 6 Declaration Hans Meyer, # 7 Exhibit B - OGIS Compliance Review, # 8 Exhibit C - Ltr. from Semo, # 9 Exhibit D (filed under seal), # 10 Exhibit E - DHS Backlog Reduction Plan 2020-23, # 11 Exhibit F - Holzer Deposition Excerpts, # 12 Exhibit G - Keenan Deposition Excerpts, # 13 Exhibit H - Meckley Deposition Excerpts, # 14 Exhibit I1 - FOIA Report FY2012, # 15 Exhibit I2 - FOIA Report FY2013, # 16 Exhibit I3 - FOIA Report FY2014, # 17 Exhibit I4 - FOIA Report FY2015, # 18 Exhibit I5 - FOIA Report FY2016, # 19 Exhibit I6 - FOIA Report FY2017, # 20 Exhibit I7 - FOIA Report FY2018, # 21 Exhibit I8 - FOIA Report FY2019, # 22 Exhibit J - Defs.' Resp. to ROG 16, # 23 Exhibit K - Defs.' Resp. to ROGs 21-24, # 24 Exhibit L (filed under seal), # 25 Exhibit M (filed under seal), # 26 Exhibit N - Defs.' Resp. to RFA 11, # 27 Exhibit O (filed under seal), # 28 Exhibit P - USCIS FOIA Backlog Reduction Plan (July 2020), # 29 Exhibit Q (filed under seal), # 30 Exhibit R (filed under seal), # 31 Exhibit S (filed under seal), # 32 Exhibit T - OGIS Compliance Review of ICE, # 33 Exhibit U - Defs.' Resp. to ROGs 4-5, # 34 Exhibit V (filed under seal), # 35 Exhibit W (filed under seal), # 36 Exhibit X (filed under seal), # 37 Exhibit Y - Stmt. of Holzer before Subcommittee, # 38 Exhibit Z - Talking Points (June 2019), # 39 Exhibit AA (filed under seal), # 40 Exhibit BB (filed under seal), # 41 Exhibit CC - USCIS FOIA Backlog Reduction Project (Apr. 2020), # 42 Exhibit DD - USCIS FOIA Backlog Reduction Project (Feb. 2020), # 43 Exhibit EE - USCIS FOIA Backlog Reduction Project (July 2020), # 44 Exhibit FF (filed under seal), # 45 Exhibit GG (filed under seal))(Related document(s) 70 , 69 ) (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-3072CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale re 69 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 68 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-1373Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14957916 by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Lieu, Tiffany) (Filed on 10/13/2020) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1674Refund Status re 73 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2020) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-2175Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to 70 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 02:00 PM in To Be Determined before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 11/4/2020. Replies due by 11/18/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristen C. Handley, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of Tammy Meckley, # 3 Exhibit 2 - DHS Deposition Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 3 - USCIS Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Fernando Pineiro, # 6 Exhibit 5 - ICE Deposition Excerpt, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Expert Declaration of Lindsay Steel, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of James Holzer, # 9 Proposed Order )(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 10/21/2020) Modified on 10/22/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-2776Consent MOTION for Leave to File Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristen C. Handley, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Fernando Pineiro, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. M, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. Q, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. R, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Redacted Version of Pls. Ex. S, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. V, # 8 Exhibit 7 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. W, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. X, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. BB, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. FF, # 12 Exhibit 11 - Redacted Version of Pls.' Ex. GG, # 13 Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 10/27/2020) Modified on 10/28/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-10-2877ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED 76 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-0478Second Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Plaintiffs' Opposition and Reply - Redacted, # 4 Plaintiffs' Opposition and Reply - Unredacted)(Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0479OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ) and Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMaribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0480CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale re 79 Opposition/Response to Motion, 78 Second Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0981OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 78 Second Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 11/9/2020) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-1882REPLY in Support (re 75 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Cristen C. Handley, # 2 Declaration Ex. 8 - Second Declaration of Fernando Pineiro, # 3 Declaration Ex. 9 - Second Declaration of Tammy Meckley, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 10 - ICE 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 11 - USCIS 30(b)(6) Deposition Excerpt)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 11/18/2020) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-12-0383Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Divide Time Between DOJ Counsel During MSJ Hearing filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 12/7/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Cristen C. Handley, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-0384ORDER ON DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION REGARDING HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 83 Administrative Motion. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2020) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-0985CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Today's Motion Hearing set for 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcast ing of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-0986Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2020. Motions taken under submission; written order to follow. Total Time in Court: 1 hour, 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-1187TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/9/2020 before Judge William H. Orrick by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2020) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2020-12-1488TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/09/2020 before Judge William H. Orrick by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-1789ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-1790JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/17/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2020) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-2191STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline Under Rule 54(d) for Plaintiffs' Submission of Attorneys' Fees Motion filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-2192Order to Extend the Deadline by Judge William H. Orrick granting 91 Stipulation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-2193Transcript of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 12/9/2020, before Judge William H. Orrick, III. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, CRR, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 87 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021. (Related documents(s) 87 ) (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-02-1294NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Appeal of Judgment 90 (Appeal fee: WAIVED) (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (USCA Case No. 21-15288) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1895USCA Case Number 21-15288 for 94 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-03-1296Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 10/11/2019; 1/21/2020; 12/9/20 before Judge Hon. William H. Orrick, (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 3/12/2021) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-1797STATUS REPORT re. Injunction Compliance by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tammy M. Meckley, # 2 Declaration of Fernando Pineiro)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 3/17/2021) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-3098STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. (Realmuto, Trina) (Filed on 3/30/2021) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-04-0299CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, an d rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts .gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-06100Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 4/6/2021. Status Report due by 6/15/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Total Time in Court: 11 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-07101TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/6/2021 before Judge William H. Orrick by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 4/7/2021) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-08102Transcript of Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on 4-6-2021, before Judge William H. Orrick. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 101 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2021. (Related documents(s) 101 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/8/2021) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-09103TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/06/2021 before Judge William H. Orrick by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Adams, Matthew) (Filed on 4/9/2021) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-06-15104STATUS REPORT re. Injunction Compliance by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fourth) of Tammy M. Meckley, # 2 Declaration (Fourth) of Fernando Pineiro)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-29105STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Filed on 6/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-07-03106CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING - The Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2021 02:00 PM will be held via Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/who General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, a nd rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourt s.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2021) (Entered: 07/03/2021)
2021-07-06107Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Orrick: Case Management Conference held on 7/6/2021. Quarterly Compliance Report due 9/15/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Total Time in Court: 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2021) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
2021-07-26108MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Maribel Carandang, Cheryl David, Pao Lopa, Courtney McDermed, Zachary Nightingale. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM before Judge William H. Orrick. Responses due by 8/9/2021. Replies due by 8/16/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lieu, Tiffany) (Filed on 7/26/2021) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-07-26109ORDER GRANTING TIFFANY LIEU'S 108 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Judge William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2021) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-08-04110ORDER of USCA granting appellants' unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal as to 94 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2021) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-16111STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Fees Motion filed by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 8/16/2021) (Entered: 08/16/2021)
2021-08-17112Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 111 Stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file any motion for attorney fees and costs on or before October 19, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wholc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-09-15113STATUS REPORT re. Injunction Compliance by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration (Fifth) of Tammy M. Meckley, # 2 Declaration (Fifth) of Fernando Pineiro)(Handley, Cristen) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar