Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv02044
Date Filed2012-12-20
Date Closed2014-02-21
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
DefendantBUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-12-201COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0090-3168644) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2012-12-20Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (ls, ) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2012-12-202ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Consent Notice)(ls, ) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2013-01-033NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver W. McDaniel on behalf of BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
2013-01-044Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
2013-01-04MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is February 22, 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/4/13. (lcabj1) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
2013-01-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2012. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2013. (Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
2013-01-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/30/2012. (Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
2013-02-227Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
2013-02-22MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer and/or other response to the complaint is due by March, 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/22/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
2013-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response or Otherwise Answer to the Complaint is due by 3/8/2013. (jth) (Entered: 02/23/2013)
2013-03-088Joint MOTION to Stay (by all Parties) by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
2013-03-11MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that this case is stayed until June 6, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report on June 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/11/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
2013-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2013. (jth) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
2013-06-069Joint MOTION to Stay by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
2013-06-07NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Motion to Stay; emailed to kdouglass@peer.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. as a Status Report (jf, ) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
2013-06-07MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that this case is stayed until July 18, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report on July 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 6/7/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
2013-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/18/2013. (jth) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
2013-07-1810Consent MOTION to Stay by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting in part 10 Motion to Stay. At the parties' request, it is ORDERED that this case is stayed. And it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a further status report on September 17, 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/19/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-19Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties Status Report is due by 9/17/2013. (jth) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-09-1711Joint MOTION to Stay by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
2013-09-17MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay [Dkt. # 11] is GRANTED. And it is FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed until October 17, 2013. The Court also notes that the parties may contact chambers if they reach the conclusion that they would benefit from the assistance of a neutral mediator. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/17/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
2013-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: This Case is Stayed until 10/17/2013. (jth) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
2013-10-0112Consent MOTION to Stay the Case Because of Lapse of Appropriations by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
2013-10-01MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that the current stay ending on October 17, 2013, is extended for a period commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations and until counsel for the government are able to resume their litigation functions. And it is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the government shall notify the Court within two business days of resumption of operations. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/1/2013. (lcabj2) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
2013-10-2113NOTICE OF RESUMPTION OF GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS AND THE PARTIES JOINT PROPOSED REVISED SCHEDULE by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
2013-10-22MINUTE ORDER continuing the stay ordered in this case on October 1, 2013 until November 6, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will submit a Joint Status Report to the Court on or before November 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/22/2013. (lcabj3) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2013. (jth) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
2013-11-0614Joint MOTION to Stay (and Status Report) by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
2013-11-0715STATUS REPORT (Joint) by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-11-07MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that this matter is stayed through and including November 21, 2013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties will submit a joint status report on December 6, 2013, if this matter has not already been dismissed by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/7/2013. (lcabj3) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
2013-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: The case is stayed through and including 11/21/2013. If this case has not already been dismissed by that date, the parties will submit a Joint Status Report on 12/6/2013. (jth) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
2013-12-0616Joint MOTION to Stay by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
2013-12-06MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that the stay in this case is continued through and including January 21, 2014. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before January 21, 2014, if this matter has not already been dismissed by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/6/2013. (lcabj3) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
2013-12-08Set/Reset Deadlines: The case is stayed through and including 1/21/2014. If this case has not already been dismissed by that date, the parties will submit a Joint Status Report on 1/21/2014. (jth) (Entered: 12/08/2013)
2014-01-2217Joint MOTION to Stay and Status Report by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Douglass, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
2014-01-2218STATUS REPORT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (See Docket Entry 17 to view document) (jf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
2014-01-22MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion to Stay. In light of the parties' joint status report, it is ORDERED that the stay in this case is continued to and including February 21, 2014. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on February 21, 2014, if this case has not been dismissed by that date. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/22/2014. (lcabj3) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
2014-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: If this case has not been dismissed by that date, the parties shall file a joint status report by 2/21/2014. (jth) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
2014-02-2119STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL by BUREAU OF SAFETY AND ENVIRONMENTAL ENFORCEMENT. (McDaniel, Oliver) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff