Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJordan v. U.S. Department of Labor
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CitySt. Joseph
Case Number5:2018cv06129
Date Filed2018-08-29
Date Closed2019-04-09
JudgeDistrict Judge Ortrie D. Smith
PlaintiffJack Jordan
Case DescriptionJack Jordan submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Labor for records concerning emails sent by employees of DynCorp International. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Jordan that his requests did not identify records that could be searched. Jordan then filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jordan filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Labor
AppealEighth Circuit 19-1743
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [24]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Missouri has dismissed part of Jack Jordan's FOIA suit against the Department of Labor after finding it was duplicative of litigation Jordan brought in the D.C. Circuit. Jordan brought suit in Missouri contending the agency had failed to respond to two FOIA requests he had submitted. The first FOIA request was for letters concerning Jordan's allegations of misconduct by administrative law judges that heard his case. The second FOIA request asked for emails sent by DynCorp International that were in the possession of DOL's Benefits Review Board. The agency asked the court to dismiss the second request because it was duplicative of litigation Jordan had brought in the D.C. Circuit. In that case, Judge Rudolph Contreras had found that an email sent by DynCorp to its attorney was privileged under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Contreras' decision was upheld by the D.C. Circuit. The federal court in Missouri agreed that the current litigation was duplicative, noting that "Plaintiff seeks to relitigate whether Defendant properly redacted the [disputed] email, asserting arguments he did or could have made before the D.C. District Court." Dismissing Jordan's second FOIA request, the court observed that "the conservation of judicial resources, comprehensive disposition of litigation, and the progress of that action weigh in favor of this Court deferring to the D.C. District Court. Plaintiff does not contend, much less set forth evidence, his rights were not adequately protected in the D.C. District Court lawsuit."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction
Opinion/Order [49]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Missouri has ruled that Jack Jordan's request that the court overturn a previous ruling against him in the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia pertaining to his FOIA requests to the Department of Labor should be denied. Jordan submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Labor " one for letters sent by the Office of the Administrative Law Judges to Jordan and the other for emails sent by employees of DynCorp International with the subject line "WPS " next steps & action.'" DOL asked the court to dismiss the case, arguing it was duplicative of litigation Jordan brought in U.S. district court in Washington, D.C. in which Judge Rudolph Contreras ruled in favor of the agency. The court agreed with the agency that Jordan's suit should be dismissed. The court noted that "plaintiff has not demonstrated he did not have a fair opportunity to argue the issues in the D.C. District Court, or this Court, and he has not shown that granting his motions is necessary to correct a significant error."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to State a Claim
Opinion/Order [55]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-08-291COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of Labor Jack Jordan. Filing fee $400, receipt number KCMO072576. Service due by 11/27/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-292NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director mailed to Plaintiff via USPS. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-10-033RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jack Jordan. U.S. Department of Labor served on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-034RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Jack Jordan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return Receipt US Attorney General)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-035Return of Service unexecuted by Jack Jordan as to U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration re Service on US Dept of Labor)(Jordan, Jack) Modified on 10/3/2018 to reflect Defendant's deadline to file answer or responsive pleading is October 1, 2018, pursuant to 5U.S.C. §552(a)(4)(C) (2000). Modified on 10/3/2018 (Matthes Mitra, Renea). (NEF regenerated.) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-106MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/31/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts & Supporting Suggestions, # 2 Declaration of Jack Jordan)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
2018-10-127MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/26/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party U.S. Department of Labor(pty:dft))(Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/12/2018)
2018-10-148SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jack Jordan 10/14/2018)(Related document(s) 7 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/14/2018)
2018-10-159REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Labor. (Related document(s) 7 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
2018-10-1910RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 12/3/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/17/2018. Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-1911RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 10/19/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-2312ORDER granting 7 Defendant U.S. Department of Labor's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer. Defendant U.S. Department of Labor shall file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by no later than 10/26/2018. Signed on 10/23/2018 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 10/23/2018)
2018-10-2613MOTION to dismiss case partially filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2614Department of Labor's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor.(Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2615MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2816SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 13 MOTION to dismiss case partially on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 11/13/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 13 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/28/2018)
2018-10-3017SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 11/13/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-0918MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 13 MOTION to dismiss case partially , 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 13 , 15 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-1019ORDER granting 18 Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply re 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment, and reply re 13 MOTION to dismiss case partially. Reply suggestions to both motions shall be filed by no later than 11/16/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Signed on 11/10/2018 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 11/10/2018)
2018-11-1620REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 13 MOTION to dismiss case partially filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Labor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-1621REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Labor. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-0422MOTION to expedite 26(f) Conference filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J. Jordan)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0623MOTION for extension of time to file proposed scheduling order/discovery plan , MOTION for order re 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/20/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J, Jordan 12/6/2018)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-1424ORDER granting 13 Defendant's motion to partially dismiss case.; granting 15 Defendant's motion for extension of time to file response to 6 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; withdrawing 22 Plaintiff's motion regarding Rule 26(f) conference; granting in part and denying in part 23 Plaintiff's motion to rule on Defendant's motion for extension of time and enlarge time to file proposed scheduling order. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment by no later than December 24, 2018. The parties shall file their joint proposed scheduling order by no later than fourteen days after Defendant files its response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed on 12/14/2018 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith.(Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-1925MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 6 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-1926SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 25 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 1/2/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-2827MOTION to amend/correct 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Judge Contreras Citations re Inference, # 2 Exhibit List of Judge Smith Citations re Inference)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-2828MOTION to clarify Judgment in separate document filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2019-01-0229First MOTION to vacate 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Huber 8/15/2017)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0430MOTION to compel DOL to file FOIA-compliant copy of Powers' email filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J, Jordan 1/4/2019)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-0431ORDER granting 25 Defendant's motion for extension of time to file response to 6 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment. Defendant's response shall be filed by no later than 1/11/2019 unless otherwise directed by the Court. Signed on 1/4/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-1032MOTION for extension of time , MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 28 MOTION to clarify Judgment in separate document , 29 First MOTION to vacate 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, , 30 MOTION to compel DOL to file FOIA-compliant copy of Powers' email , 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment , 27 MOTION to amend/correct 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 28 , 29 , 30 , 6 , 27 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1033SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 32 MOTION for extension of time MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 28 MOTION to clarify Judgment in separate document , 29 First MOTION to vacate 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/ on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 1/24/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-2834ORDER granting 32 Defendant's motion for extensions of time, and overruling Plaintiff's objections to Defendants's motion for extensions of time. By no later than February 15, 2019, Defendant shall file its responses to 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 27 Plaintiff's Motion for FRCP 60 Relief Regarding Treatment of Inferences and Credibility; 28 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Judgment; 29 Plaintiff's First Motion for FRCP 60 Relief for Fraud, Misconduct and Misrepresentation by the Department of Labor and Department of Justice; and 30 Plaintiff's Motion to Order Defendant to Comply with FOIA. Signed on 1/28/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-1535Cross MOTION for summary judgment and suggestions in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [Doc. 6] filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/8/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1, # 3 Exhibit Attachment 2, # 4 Exhibit Attachment 3, # 5 Exhibit Attachment 4, # 6 Exhibit Attachment 5, # 7 Exhibit Attachment 6, # 8 Exhibit Attachment 7)(Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-1536SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 28 MOTION to clarify Judgment in separate document , 29 First MOTION to vacate 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, , 30 MOTION to compel DOL to file FOIA-compliant copy of Powers' email , 27 MOTION to amend/correct 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Labor. Reply suggestions due by 3/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 28 , 29 , 30 , 27 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-1537MOTION to join Ferissa Talley as a plaintiff filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of F. Talley 2/14/2019, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of J. Jordan 2/15/2019, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 Email from BRB Denying FOIA Request 2/4/2019, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 Email from Imbrie 8/28/2013, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 3 Emails from Cox to Begin, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 Huber memo to DOS 4/8/2014)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines as to 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment . Reply suggestions due by 3/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-02-2038MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to 35 Cross MOTION for summary judgment and suggestions in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [Doc. 6] , MOTION for leave to file excess pages filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/6/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-2339REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 30 MOTION to compel DOL to file FOIA-compliant copy of Powers' email on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. (Related document(s) 30 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 02/23/2019)
2019-02-2340REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 28 MOTION to clarify Judgment in separate document on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. (Related document(s) 28 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 02/23/2019)
2019-02-2741REPLY SUGGESTIONS to 29 First MOTION to vacate 27 Motion to Amend 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, , 27 MOTION to amend/correct 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. (Related document(s) 29 , 27 ) (Jordan, Jack) Modified on 2/27/2019 to correct event (Crocker, Susan). (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-2742Joint MOTION for extension of time to file Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-2843ORDER granting 42 the parties' joint to extend the time to file a joint proposed scheduling. If necessary, the Court will issue a new deadline for the parties to file a joint proposed scheduling order once it has issued rulings on the currently pending motions. Signed on 2/28/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-0144SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 37 MOTION to join Ferissa Talley as a plaintiff filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Defendant U.S. Department of Labor. Reply suggestions due by 3/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0445REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 37 MOTION to join Ferissa Talley as a plaintiff on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0446MOTION for leave to file Reply & Opposition re Summary Judgment filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply re: Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion and Opposition to DOL Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jack Jordan 3/4/2019)(Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-0747ORDER granting (Doc. #38) Plaintiff's motion for additional time to file his reply to his motion for partial summary judgment (Doc. #6) and file his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. #35), and granting (Doc. #46) Plaintiff's motion for leave to exceed the pages limitations set forth by the Local Rules. Plaintiff shall electronically file his reply to his motion for partial summary judgment and his response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by no later than March 8, 2019. The argument section of Plaintiff's brief, which incorporates both filings, shall not exceed 20 pages. Signed on 3/7/2019 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kitsmiller, Julia) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-0748REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 35 Cross MOTION for summary judgment and suggestions in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [Doc. 6] , 6 MOTION for partial summary judgment on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J, Jordan 3/4/2019)(Related document(s) 35 , 6 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines as to 35 Cross MOTION for summary judgment . Reply suggestions due by 3/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houston, Kiambu) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-1149ORDER (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S RULE 58 MOTION, (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S RULE 60 MOTIONS, AND (3) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER, 27 , 28 , 29 , 30 . Signed on 3/11/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-1250MOTION for reconsideration re 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/26/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-2251MOTION for protective order filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of U.S. Department of Labor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2252SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 51 MOTION for protective order on behalf of Plaintiff Jack Jordan. Reply suggestions due by 4/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of J, Jordan 3/22/2019)(Related document(s) 51 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-03-2753SUPPLEMENT Corrections to Motion to Reconsider . (Related document(s) 50 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-03-2954MOTION for order re 50 MOTION for reconsideration re 24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,,,, Order on Motion to Expedite,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Jack Jordan. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/12/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 50 ) (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-04-0955ORDER AND OPINION (1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER, (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, (3) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND (4) DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO JOIN A PARTY, DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER. Signed on 4/9/19 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0956CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0957NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 56 Clerk's Judgment by Jack Jordan. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMOWDC-6262304. (Jordan, Jack) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0958TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals, 8th Circuit via electronic mail. Related document 57 Notice of Appeal. (Cole, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar