Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleProctor v. National Archives and Records Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2018cv05672
Date Filed2018-09-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore
PlaintiffMelanie Lea Proctor
Case DescriptionMelanie Proctor submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning her deposition by the Office of the Independent Counsel in 1998. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied Proctor's request under Exemption 3 (other statutes). Proctor filed an administrative appeal, which was also denied. Proctor then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [19]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-09-171COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against National Archives and Records Administration (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt No. 44611015701). Filed by Melanie L Proctor. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Receipt)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-172Declaration of Melanie L. Proctor in Support of 1 Complaint, filed by Melanie L Proctor. (Related document(s) 1 ) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-173Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-174CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
2018-09-205Summons Issued as to National Archives and Records Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
2018-09-266CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Melanie L Proctor. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-267MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Melanie L Proctor. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-268CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Melanie L Proctor re 7 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing, 6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-269SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melanie L Proctor. National Archives and Records Administration served on 9/25/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
2018-09-2810ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 7 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-1811CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by National Archives and Records Administration. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 10/18/2018) Modified on 10/18/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-2912ANSWER to Complaint byNational Archives and Records Administration. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 10/29/2018) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-11-0913STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines filed by National Archives and Records Administration and Melanie Lea Proctor. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 11/9/2018) Modified on 11/9/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-1414Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 13 Stipulation to Vacate Case Management Conference etc. Dispositive Motion due by 1/11/2019.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-2615ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 14 Order on Stipulation TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE DURING LAPSE IN FUNDING filed by National Archives and Records Administration. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Daw, Alison) (Filed on 12/26/2018) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-2716OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re 14 Order on Stipulation TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE DURING LAPSE IN FUNDING ) Non-Opposition filed byMelanie Lea Proctor. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 12/27/2018) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-0317Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 15 Administrative Motion to Stay Scheduling for Summary Judgment Motions.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-3118STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO LIFT STAY AND SET NEW SCHEDULE re 17 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, 14 Order on Stipulation filed by National Archives and Records Administration. (Daw, Alison) (Filed on 1/31/2019) Modified on 1/31/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-0519ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Granting 18 Stipulation TO LIFT STAY AND SET NEW SCHEDULE. Motions due by 3/7/2019; Opposition/Cross Motions due by 3/28/2019; Opposition/Replies due by 4/18/2018; Replies due by 4/25/2019 and Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-03-0720MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Melanie Lea Proctor. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 3/28/2019. Replies due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Melanie Proctor II)(Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 3/7/2019) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-2821MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Archives and Records Administration. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Replies due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Britney Crawford, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-I to the Crawford Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(Daw, Alison) (Filed on 3/28/2019) Modified on 3/29/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-1822OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) Reply in Support Of 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMelanie Lea Proctor. (Proctor, Melanie) (Filed on 4/18/2019) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar