Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBLIXSETH v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02281
Date Filed2018-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffTIMOTHY BLIXSETH
Case DescriptionTimothy Blixseth submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning emails sent to or received by Albert Steiglitz Jr. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked Blixseth to narrow the scope of his request. He did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Blixseth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-011COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5715730) filed by Timothy Blixseth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Notice and Consent, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(Himes, Lisa) Modified on 10/9/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-012NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Timothy Blixseth. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-00593. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/01/2018)
2018-10-03Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-054RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/4/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/3/2018. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/4/2018. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/4/2018 (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-11-057Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-06MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file its Answer by November 7, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/6/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/7/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-078ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 23, 2018. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/8/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/23/2018. (znbn) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-219Joint STATUS REPORT and Request for Scheduling Conference by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. (Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-2110Joint MOTION for Hearing Scheduling Conference by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (See Docket Entry 9 to view docuement). (znmw) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-26MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that a Scheduling Conference is set for December 17, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 25. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/26/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-26Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 25 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-17Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2018. Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Saint-Loth) (znbn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall process documents containing only the terms "Blixseth" and "BGI"; 2) Such documents shall be processed at the rate of 300 pages per month starting on February 1, 2019; 3) Seven days after the last production, the parties shall file a joint status report; and 4) The processing of all other documents may be held in abeyance until further Order of the Court. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/17/2018. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall process documents containing only the terms "Blixseth" and "BGI"; Such documents shall be processed at the rate of 300 pages per month starting on 2/1/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-02-0411MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Defendant's First Production of Records to Plaintiff by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER: If Plaintiff opposes Defendant's 11 Motion for Extension, the Court ORDERS that he shall file such opposition by February 7, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/5/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 2/7/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0512RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Defendant's First Production of Records to Plaintiff filed by TIMOTHY BLIXSETH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Himes, Lisa) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 11 Motion for Extension is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART and that production shall be made by March 8, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/6/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Production shall be made by 3/8/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar