Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSamuel v. US Secret Service
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityCharleston
Case Number2:2018cv02715
Date Filed2018-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Richard M Gergel
PlaintiffRobert T Samuel, III
Case DescriptionRobert Samuel submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Secret Service for records concerning hacking incidents against the agency. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After the agency did not respond further, Samuel filed a complaint with the Office of Government Information Services. OGIS also acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further, Samuel filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantUS Secret Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-051COMPLAINT against US Secret Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX200015849.), filed by Robert T Samuel, III. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents) (egra, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-10-053Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert T Samuel, III. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
2018-11-198PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 12/10/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 11/19/2018. (egra, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-199***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 Proper Form Order, and required documents placed in U.S. Mail to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417. (egra, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-12-0613ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 12/06/2018. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-0614Summons Issued as to US Secret Service. Service due by 3/6/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-0615***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Order Service - Non-Inmate, 14 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint placed in U.S. Mail to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417. (egra, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-2816SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert T Samuel, III. US Secret Service served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service - Attorney General, # 2 Affidavit of Service - Secret Service, # 3 Affidavit of Service - US Attorney) (egra, ) Refiled to correct event type (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-3017MOTION for Extension of Time by US Secret Service. Response to Motion due by 2/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-3118TEXT ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time. Answer due by March 1, 2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 01/31/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-01-3119***DOCUMENT MAILED 18 TEXT Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417. (egra, ) (Entered: 01/31/2019)
2019-02-2820MOTION for Summary Judgment by US Secret Service. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Kevin Tyrell)No proposed order.Motions referred to Bristow Marchant.(Bowens, Barbara) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-0121ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by 4/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 03/01/2019. (egra, ) (Main Document 21 replaced on 3/4/2019) (egra, ). Modified on 3/4/2019 to replace with corrected document (egra, ). (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-0122***DOCUMENT MAILED 21 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417. (egra, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-04-0923REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. It is recommended that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution. However, in consideration of Plaintiff's status as a pro se litigant, it is recommended that this dismissal be without prejudice. The Clerk shall mail this Report and Recommendation to Plaintiff at his last known address. If the Plaintiff notifies the Court within the time set forth for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation that he wishes to continue with this case and provides a response to the motion for summary judgment, the Clerk is directed to vacate this Report and Recommendation and return this file to the undersigned for further handling. If, however, no objections are filed, the Clerk shall forward this Report and Recommendation to the District Judge for disposition. Objections to R&R due by 4/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 04/09/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-0924***DOCUMENT MAILED 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by US Secret Service placed in U.S. Mail to Robert T Samuel, III P.O. Box 32311 Charleston, SC 29417. (egra, ) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar