Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSatterlee v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service et al
DistrictWestern District of Missouri
CitySpringfield
Case Number6:2018cv03348
Date Filed2018-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Roseann Ketchmark
PlaintiffRonald Leroy Satterlee
Case DescriptionRonald Satterlee submitted FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning notices and demands for his taxes for various years. The agency told him that any notices and demands would have been computer-generated and would not be retained by the agency. Dissatisfied by that answer, Satterlee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantCommissioner of Internal Revenue Service
ATTN: CC:PA:Br 6/7
1111 Constitution Avenue
NW Washington, D.C. 20224
DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Disclosure - Attn. Ron Mele
135 High Street, M/S 106
Hartford, CT 06103
DefendantDisclosure Officer
Disclosures Services
Room 1054-MT
U.S. Department of the Treasury
Washington, D.C. 20220
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-191PRO SE COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Officer, Internal Revenue Service Ronald Leroy Satterlee Filing fee $400. Service due by 1/17/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-192PRO SE MOTION for order Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/2/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
2018-10-22SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Officer, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Prepared Summonses issued, and returned to Plaintiff via USPS first class mail. NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-223NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order). Notice, General Order, and NEF mailed to Plaintiff via USPS first class mail. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/22/2018)
2018-10-24RECEIPT number KCMO073635 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Ronald Satterlee. Receipt mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
2018-10-264ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Roseann Ketchmark and pursuant to Local Rule 83.9, this case is hereby transferred. Case reassigned to District Judge Roseann Ketchmark for all further proceedings. District Judge M. Douglas Harpool no longer assigned to case Signed on 10/26/18 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Howard, Linda) Modified on 10/26/2018 copy of NEF mailed to pltf (Howard, Linda). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-11-135Pro Se CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)NEF mailed to plaintiff. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-196ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 pro se Motion to Compel Preparation of a Vaughn Index: the Motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling the motion after a defendant has entered an appearance in this case or defaulted. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee via regular mail. Signed on 11/19/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Phillips, Caleb) Modified on 11/20/2018 (Furtak, Rebecca). Copy of order mailed to Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee at HC71, PMB 259A, Ava, MO 65608. (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2019-01-157PRO SE MOTION for extension of time filed by Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Envelope). Copy of NEF mailed to plaintiff Satterlee.(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-158ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Serve Defendants. Return of service of all Defendants is due no more than thirty days after the United States Government Shutdown concludes. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via regular mail. Signed on 1/15/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Stout, Courtney) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/16/2019 reflect the Court's directive to the Clerk of Court to return the summons filed with Plaintiff's Motion to Plaintiff via regular mail) (Stout, Courtney). Modified on 1/16/2019 (Stout, Courtney). Modified on 1/17/2019 copy of order and summons mailed to plaintiff Satterlee (Siegert, Karen). (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-229CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)NEF mailed to defendant. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-30SUMMONS REISSUED as to Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Officer, Internal Revenue Service, U.S. Attorney Generals Office, and U.S. Attorney. Emailed to Plaintiff for service. (Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-02-0710Pro Se CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ronald Leroy Satterlee on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)NEF mailed to plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-03-0511MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service, Disclosure Officer, Internal Revenue Service. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Attorney Catriona Madalyn Coppler added to party Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft), Attorney Catriona Madalyn Coppler added to party Disclosure Officer(pty:dft), Attorney Catriona Madalyn Coppler added to party Internal Revenue Service(pty:dft))(Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-0512ORDER granting 11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' Answer due April 5, 2019. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail a copy of this docket sheet to Plaintiff. Signed on 3/5/2019 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-04-0513MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Internal Revenue Service. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-0514SUGGESTIONS in support re 13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Catriona Madalyn Coppler on behalf of Defendant Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Denise Higley, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Higley Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Higley Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Higley Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Higley Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Higley Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Higley Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Higley Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Higley Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Higley Declaration, # 11 Declaration of Patricia Perez)(Related document(s) 13 ) (Coppler, Catriona) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-1915PRO SE Plaintiff's PLAINTIFF'S MOTION PLAINTIFFS' SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS in opposition re 13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Reply suggestions due by 5/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Envelope) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Related document(s) 13 ) (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
2019-04-1916PRO SE PLAINTIFF'S SUGGESTIONS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re 13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Leroy Satterlee. Reply suggestions due by 5/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 4, 5 & 6, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Envelope)(Related document(s) 13 ) NEF mailed to Plaintiff. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 04/19/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar