Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSouthern Environmental Law Center v. Council on Environmental Quality
DistrictWestern District of Virginia
CityCharlottesville
Case Number3:2018cv00113
Date Filed2018-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Glen E. Conrad
PlaintiffSouthern Environmental Law Center
Case DescriptionThe Southern Environmental Law Center submitted a FOIA request to the Council on Environmental Quality for records concerning its notice of rulemaking pertaining to revising procedural provisions of the National Environmental Policy Act. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. SELC then updated its request to broaden its scope. CEQ acknowledged receipt of the updated request. SELC also requested a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, SELC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCouncil on Environmental Quality
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-301COMPLAINT against Council on Environmental Quality (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3026394.), filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 - July 19, 2018 FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Sept. 5, 2018 Updated FOIA Request)(jcj)
2018-11-302Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Environmental Law Center (jcj)
2018-11-303Electronic Summons Issued as to Council on Environmental Quality, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: # 1 CEQ summons, # 2 AG summons)(jcj)
2018-12-034MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3027010. by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on Motion for Admission pro hac vice)(Butler, Morgan)
2018-12-045ORDER granting 4 MOTION for Kimberley Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kimberley Claire Hunter for Southern Environmental Law Center added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/3/18. (hnw)
2018-12-266MOTION to Stay by Council on Environmental Quality. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lugar, Justin)
2019-01-107ORDER granting 6 Motion to Stay deadlines to respond to the complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/10/2019. (hnw)
2019-01-298NOTICE by Council on Environmental Quality (Lugar, Justin)
2019-02-019ANSWER to Complaint 1 by Council on Environmental Quality.(Lugar, Justin)
2019-02-0410Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jcj)
2019-02-1511MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Hunter, Kimberley)
2019-02-1512Brief / Memorandum in Support re 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Hunter, Kimberley)
2019-03-0113Response re 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Council on Environmental Quality. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lugar, Justin)
2019-03-0814REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . filed by Southern Environmental Law Center. (Butler, Morgan)
2019-04-1915Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiff Southern Environmental Law Center (Hunter, Kimberley)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar