Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00325
Date Filed2019-02-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffADAM ENTOUS
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and New Yorker reporter Adam Entous submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the Accountability Review Board report on the acoustic attack in Cuba that affected members at the U.S. Embassy in Havana and efforts to implement its recommendations. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, JMP and Entous filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-071COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5935521) filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, Adam Entous. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons USAO)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-08Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-082ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) Modified on 2/11/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error and corrected summons will be re-issued. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/11/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USAG receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-255RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/11/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/13/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USADC receipt)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-03-136NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of ADAM ENTOUS, JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-137NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-138NOTICE Regarding Service by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-15MINUTE ORDER. In light of the defendant's notice 8 , it is ORDERED that defendant must respond to plaintiffs' complaint by April 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/15/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-019ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0110ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiffs, on or before May 1, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/1/2019. (lcabj2) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar