Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00350
Date Filed2019-02-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffPLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.
Case DescriptionPlanned Parenthood Federation of America submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning the agency's decision to renew Title X healthcare services grants for seven months rather than the usual three years. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Planned Parenthood that its request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Planned Parenthood filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-121COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5942246) filed by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-123MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Hannah Swanson, :Firm- Planned Parenthood Federation of America, :Address- hannah.swanson@ppfa.org. Phone No. - 202-973-4800. Fax No. - 202-296-3480 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5942452. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-124LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Muniz, Richard) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/13/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER granting the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Hannah Swanson may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 12, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-145NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Swanson on behalf of PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC. (Swanson, Hannah) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-156ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Muniz, Richard) Modified on 2/20/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-20NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney; emailed to richard.muniz@ppfa.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect dates of service; Refile with proof of delivery; Delivery date is correct date of service. (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)
2019-02-217ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/17/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/15/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Muniz, Richard); Modified on 2/27/2019 (tth). (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/22/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-27NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 7 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General, Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, was entered in error at the request of counsel. Said pleading was refiled as Docket Entry 8 . (tth) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-259NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-2510ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/25/2019)
2019-03-26MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before April 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 26, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/15/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-04-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION OF AMERICA, INC.. (Muniz, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-11MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 11 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 11, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar