Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00388
Date Filed2019-02-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted three FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning memoranda signed by acting FBI Director Andrew McCabe between April and May 2017, as well as any mention of using the 25th Amendment to remove President Trump. The agency acknowledged receipt of that request. Judicial Watch submitted a second FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning surreptitious recordings made by anyone at DOJ of meetings between officials from the White House or the Vice President's Office. Judicial Watch submitted a third FOIA to DOJ for records concerning Assistant Attorney General Rod Rosenstein's participation in any of these meetings. The agency acknowledged receipt of all three requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Vaughn index, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-141COMPLAINT against U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5947941) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-14Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-03-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S.DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/25/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar