Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00398
Date Filed2019-02-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for any opinions written by the Office of Legal Counsel concerning the president's ability to invoke emergency powers to declare a national emergency. CREW also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied CREW's request for expedited processing and told CREW that it was unable to respond within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5950854) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons AG, # 4 Summons USA)(Weismann, Anne) Modified on 2/15/2019 (zef, ). (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-15Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-264AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Dep't of Homeland Security, # 2 Summons Department of Defense)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-275SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (ztd) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/25/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/25/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/27/2019.) (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-277ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint , ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Cartier, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/27/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 5/3/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/4/19. (DJS) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2019. (tb) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar