Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLegal Aid Justice Center v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2019cv00201
Date Filed2019-02-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge T. S. Ellis, III
PlaintiffLegal Aid Justice Center
DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-211Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6503000.), filed by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Ryan, Hallie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-212Proposed Summons by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Ryan, Hallie) (Main Document 2 replaced on 2/21/2019) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-21Notice of Correction re 2 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the proposed summons 2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-213Proposed Summons (proper file format) by Legal Aid Justice Center. (Ryan, Hallie) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-224Summons Issued as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-03-125NOTICE by Legal Aid Justice Center Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavits of Process Server)(Ryan, Hallie) (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-04-026ORDERED that, on or before May 28, 2019, if Plaintiff's Complaint has not been amended or otherwise voluntarily dismissed, ICE shall file an answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, and it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before April 29, 2019, the parties will file a joint status report. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 4/2/2019. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar