Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00449
Date Filed2019-02-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Government Accountability Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of State, the CIA, the Department of Commerce, the Department of Treasury, the Department of Defense, and the Department of Energy for records concerning attempts by the Trump administration and individuals associated with it, to promote civil nuclear energy in the Middle East, particularly Saudi Arabia. GAP also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, GAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-02-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5961046) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Department of State, # 5 Summons CIA, # 6 Summons Department of Commerce, # 7 Summons Department of the Treasury, # 8 Summons Department of Defense, # 9 Summons Department of Energy)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-22Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-223SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-244STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/24/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 02/24/2019)
2019-03-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 3/5/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 3/4/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/5/2019; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 3/4/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/4/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/3/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/5/19. (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-286ERRATA by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT 5 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant,,, Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney,,, Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General,,. (Attachments: # 1 Errata)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-03-287RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/25/2019; (See docket entry no. 6 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 03/28/2019)
2019-04-038Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/3/2019. (lcrdm3, ) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 5/15/2019. (kt) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar